Label Solutions Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037642112) was incorporated on 05 Mar 1999. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 7 Serl Place, Goodwood Heights, Auckland, 2105 (type: registered, physical). 16 Drumquin Rise, Dannemora, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 18 Mar 2019. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Smith, Michael (an individual) located at Goodwood Heights, Auckland postcode 2105. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Blakeman, Lisa May (an individual) - located at Goodwood Heights, Auckland. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Serl Place, Goodwood Heights, Auckland, 2105 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Mar 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Smith
Goodwood Heights, Auckland, 2105
Address used since 23 Mar 2016 |
Director | 05 Mar 1999 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
16 Drumquin Rise, Dannemora, Auckland, 2016 | Physical & registered | 13 Feb 2014 - 18 Mar 2019 |
7 Serl Place, Silkwood Heights, Manukau | Physical & registered | 26 Feb 2007 - 13 Feb 2014 |
25 Rakaia Rise, Manukau Heights, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 26 Feb 2007 |
25 Rakaia Rise, Manukau Heights, Auckland | Physical | 08 Mar 1999 - 26 Feb 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smith, Michael Individual |
Goodwood Heights Auckland 2105 |
28 Mar 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Blakeman, Lisa May Individual |
Goodwood Heights Auckland 2105 |
28 Mar 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smith, Michael Individual |
Silkwood Heights Manukau |
05 Mar 1999 - 19 Jun 2013 |
Holmes, John Robin Individual |
Mt Albert Auckland |
28 Mar 2007 - 19 Jun 2013 |
Blakeman, Lisa May Individual |
Silkwood Heights Manukau |
05 Mar 1999 - 19 Jun 2013 |
Sankom Investments Limited 16 Drunquin Rise |
|
Ramesh Kumar Chartered Accountant Limited 16 Drumquin Rise |
|
Kishore Trustee Limited 18 Drumquin Rise |
|
Mctc Limited 14 Drumquin Rise |
|
Sai Meerah & Rama Limited 5 Drumquin Rise |
|
Ps Vijay Investments Limited 9 Drumquin Rise |