Matamata Post and Rails (1999) Limited (issued a business number of 9429037731724) was started on 03 Nov 1998. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 20 Arawa Street, Matamata, Matamata, 3400 (type: physical, registered). Mangawhero Road, R D 3, Matamata had been their registered address, until 15 Aug 2013. 1200 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 590 shares (49.17 per cent of shares), namely:
Candy Gillespie Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at Matamata,
Hodge, Linda Dorothy (an individual) located at Matamata, Matamata postcode 3400,
Hodge, Brett Leslie (an individual) located at Matamata, Matamata postcode 3400. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.83 per cent of all shares (10 shares); it includes
Hodge, Brett Leslie (an individual) - located at Matamata, Matamata. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (10 shares, 0.83%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Hodge, Linda Dorothy, located at Matamata, Matamata (an individual). Businesscheck's data was last updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 Arawa Street, Matamata, Matamata, 3400 | Physical & registered & service | 15 Aug 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Brett Leslie Hodge
Matamata, 3400
Address used since 19 Aug 2015 |
Director | 03 Nov 1998 - current |
Linda Dorothy Hodge
Matamata, 3400
Address used since 19 Aug 2015 |
Director | 03 Nov 1998 - 23 Dec 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Mangawhero Road, R D 3, Matamata | Registered | 13 Apr 2000 - 15 Aug 2013 |
Mangawhero Road, R D 3, Matamata | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 13 Apr 2000 |
Mangawhero Road, R D 3, Matamata | Physical | 04 Nov 1998 - 15 Aug 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Candy Gillespie Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037997878 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Matamata |
18 Oct 2019 - current |
Hodge, Linda Dorothy Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
19 Oct 2004 - current |
Hodge, Brett Leslie Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
19 Oct 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodge, Brett Leslie Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
03 Nov 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodge, Linda Dorothy Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
03 Nov 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Magill, Terrence Michael Individual |
Rd 2 Tirau 3485 |
19 Oct 2004 - 18 Oct 2019 |
Magill, Terrence Michael Individual |
Rd 2 Tirau 3485 |
19 Oct 2004 - 18 Oct 2019 |
Becks Nurseries 1998 Limited 20 Arawa Street, Matamata |
|
Stanlyn Hardware Limited 20 Arawa Street |
|
Richard Wine Limited 20 Arawa Street |
|
Shaune Ritchie Racing Limited 20 Arawa Street, Matamata |
|
Cyh Limited 20 Arawa Street |
|
Nickel Builders Limited 20 Arawa Street |