Igc Dorel New Zealand Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429037829230) was started on 09 Jun 1998. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: registered, physical). 470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 22 Mar 2013. Igc Dorel New Zealand Limited used other names, namely: In Good Care (New Zealand) Limited from 06 Dec 2000 to 13 Mar 2007, Adt Limited (20 Jun 2000 to 06 Dec 2000) and Anne Davies Trading Limited (09 Jun 1998 - 20 Jun 2000). 1000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
124 078 762 - Dorel Australia Pty Limited (an other) located at Sunshine West, Victoria, Australia. Our database was last updated on 10 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Service & physical | 03 Jul 2012 |
470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered | 22 Mar 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Fernando Jose Correia
Kensington, Victoria, 3031
Address used since 20 Sep 2018 |
Director | 20 Sep 2018 - current |
Dean Jennings
Docklands, Victoria, 3008
Address used since 23 May 2021
Montmorency, Victoria, 3094
Address used since 24 Jun 2020
Sunshine West, Victoria, 3020
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
North Warrandyte, Victoria, 3113
Address used since 27 May 2014
Sunshine West, Victoria, 3020
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 27 May 2014 - 28 Apr 2023 |
Roger Paul Enriquez
Panton Hill, Victoria, 3759
Address used since 15 Mar 2017
Sunshine West, Victoria,
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Sunshine West, Victoria,
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 01 Aug 2012 - 29 May 2018 |
Jean-claude Rene Jacomin
Apt 1725b, Montreal, Quebec, H3G 1Y2
Address used since 28 Aug 2012 |
Director | 28 Aug 2012 - 10 Mar 2017 |
Hani Basile
Kirkland, Quebec,
Address used since 01 Aug 2012 |
Director | 01 Aug 2012 - 28 Aug 2012 |
Robert Berchik
Port Melbourne, Australia 3207,
Address used since 07 Mar 2008 |
Director | 07 Mar 2008 - 01 Aug 2012 |
Deirdre Anne Brewer
Howick, Auckland,
Address used since 15 Jun 2006 |
Director | 09 Jun 1998 - 07 Mar 2008 |
Deirdre Anne Davies
Howick, Auckland,
Address used since 09 Jun 1998 |
Director | 09 Jun 1998 - 28 Jun 2001 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
470 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered | 03 Jul 2012 - 22 Mar 2013 |
C/- Hayes Knight, Parnell House, 470 Parnell Road, Auckland | Physical & registered | 07 Jul 2001 - 03 Jul 2012 |
C/- Bowden Impey & Sage, Parnell House, 470 Parnell Road, Auckland | Physical & registered | 07 Jul 2001 - 07 Jul 2001 |
C/- Bowden Impey & Sage, Parnell House, 470 Parnell Road, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 07 Jul 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
124 078 762 - Dorel Australia Pty Limited Other (Other) |
Sunshine West Victoria, Australia |
05 Apr 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Igc (australia) Pty Limited Other |
09 Jun 1998 - 05 Apr 2007 | |
Null - Igc (australia) Pty Limited Other |
09 Jun 1998 - 05 Apr 2007 |
Name | Dorel Australia Pty Ltd |
Type | Australian Proprietary Company |
Country of origin | AU |
Farrah Breads Limited 470 Parnell Road |
|
Weston Mcdonald Trustee Limited 470 Parnell Road |
|
The House Company Limited 470 Parnell Road |
|
Takutai Trustee Limited 470 Parnell Road |
|
Hicks Family Trustees Limited 470 Parnell Road |
|
Leo Peng Trustee Limited 470 Parnell Road |