Ej & Cj Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429037837785) was started on 05 Jun 1998. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: P O Box 204, Greenhithe, Auckland, 0756 (type: postal, registered). 41 Pounamu Ave, Greenhithe, Auckland had been their registered address, until 16 Apr 2015. Ej & Cj Limited used more aliases, namely: Chevan Builders Limited from 05 Jun 1998 to 22 May 2001. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Jones, Evan Owen (an individual) located at Greenhithe, Auckland postcode 0632. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Jones, Cherie Heather Irene (an individual) - located at Greenhithe, Auckland. Our data was updated on 26 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
34 Pitoitoi Avenue, Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Apr 2015 |
P O Box 204, Greenhithe, Auckland, 0756 | Postal | 24 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Evan Owen Jones
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 28 Mar 2017 |
Director | 05 Jun 1998 - current |
Cherie Heather Irene Jones
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 16 Apr 2015 |
Director | 05 Jun 1998 - current |
34 Pitoitoi Avenue , Greenhithe , Auckland , 0632 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
41 Pounamu Ave, Greenhithe, Auckland | Registered & physical | 11 Apr 2007 - 16 Apr 2015 |
11 Orwell Road, Greenhithe, Auckland | Registered & physical | 02 Sep 2005 - 11 Apr 2007 |
91 Te Wharau Drive, Greenhithe, Auckland | Physical | 03 Apr 2001 - 02 Sep 2005 |
103 A Sunset Road, Glenfield, Auckland | Registered | 03 Apr 2001 - 02 Sep 2005 |
103 Sunset Road, Glenfield, Auckland | Physical | 03 Apr 2001 - 03 Apr 2001 |
109 Sunset Road, Glenfield, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 03 Apr 2001 |
109 Sunset Road, Glenfield, Auckland | Registered | 04 May 1999 - 12 Apr 2000 |
109 Sunset Road, Glenfield, Auckland | Physical | 05 Jun 1998 - 03 Apr 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Evan Owen Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
05 Jun 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Cherie Heather Irene Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
05 Jun 1998 - current |
Crawford Trustee Limited 42 Pitoitoi Avenue |
|
Volare Consulting Limited 53 Admirals Court Drive |
|
Superior Construction Group Limited 49 Admirals Court Drive |
|
Ejy Property Investment Limited 49 Admirals Court Drive |
|
Possum Bourne Memorial Trust 27 Pitoitoi Avenue |
|
Kambell & Moe Limited 60 Admirals Court Drive |