Mindware Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037851507) was started on 07 May 1998. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 10 Otira Grove, Kelson, Lower Hutt, 5010 (type: registered, physical). C/- 85 College Hill, Ponsonby, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 10 Dec 2005. Mindware Limited used other names, namely: Rockford Securities Limited from 07 May 1998 to 28 Oct 1998. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Hindmarsh, Pamela Beryl (an individual) located at Kelson, Lower Hutt postcode 5010. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Russell, Andrew Francis (an individual) - located at Kelson, Lower Hutt. "Computer consultancy service" (business classification M700010) is the classification the ABS issued Mindware Limited. Our database was updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
10 Otira Grove, Kelson, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Service & physical | 02 Dec 2005 |
10 Otira Grove, Kelson, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered | 10 Dec 2005 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew Francis Russell
Kelson, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 01 Mar 2005 |
Director | 21 May 1998 - current |
Garth Osmond Melville
Ponsonby, Auckland,
Address used since 07 May 1998 |
Director | 07 May 1998 - 21 May 1998 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/- 85 College Hill, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 10 Dec 2005 |
176 Miromiro Road, Normandale, Lower Hutt | Physical | 04 Jun 1998 - 02 Dec 2005 |
C/- 85 College Hill, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered | 04 Jun 1998 - 12 Apr 2000 |
C/- 85 College Hill, Ponsonby, Auckland | Physical | 04 Jun 1998 - 04 Jun 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hindmarsh, Pamela Beryl Individual |
Kelson Lower Hutt 5010 |
07 May 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Russell, Andrew Francis Individual |
Kelson Lower Hutt 5010 |
07 May 1998 - current |
Pivot Media Limited 6 New Street |
|
Aurum Fine Jewellery Limited 89 College Hill |
|
El Trustee Company Limited 91 College Hill |
|
Rutherford Rede Limited 91 College Hill |
|
Olga Halligan Trustee Limited 91 College Hill |
|
Number Ninety One Limited 91 College Hill |
Pillar Technology Limited 4 Green Street |
Global Speech Networks Limited 9 Redmond Street |
Cloudcover Limited 19e Blake Street |
Arragro Limited 19e Blake Street |
Spicer & Spicer Limited 19e Blake Street |
Lente Limited 19e Blake Street |