Education Personnel Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037875497) was incorporated on 09 Apr 1998. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 11626, Manners Street, Wellington, 6142 (type: postal, office). 2 Rongotai Road, Kilbirnie, Wellington had been their registered address, until 28 May 2010. 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 5 shares (5 per cent of shares), namely:
Birch, Gillian Maree (an individual) located at Wellington. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 43 per cent of all shares (43 shares); it includes
Sj Birch and Sj Houpt As Trustees (an other) - located at Newtown, Wellington. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Birch, Stuart John, located at Newtown, Wellington (an individual). "Educational support services n.e.c." (business classification P822020) is the category the ABS issued Education Personnel Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 7, 94 Dixon Street, Wellington | Registered & physical & service | 28 May 2010 |
Po Box 11626, Manners Street, Wellington, 6142 | Postal | 06 May 2019 |
Level 7, 94 Dixon Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6142 | Office & delivery | 06 May 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stuart John Birch
Newtown, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 05 May 2014 |
Director | 09 Apr 1998 - current |
Level 7, 94 Dixon Street , Te Aro , Wellington , 6142 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2 Rongotai Road, Kilbirnie, Wellington | Registered | 28 May 2001 - 28 May 2010 |
23 Bay Road, Kilbirnie, Wellington | Physical | 28 May 2001 - 28 May 2010 |
2 Rongotai Road, Kilbirnie, Wellington | Physical | 28 May 2001 - 28 May 2001 |
2 Rongotai Road, Kilbirnie, Wellington | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 28 May 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Birch, Gillian Maree Individual |
Wellington |
09 Apr 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sj Birch And Sj Houpt As Trustees Other (Other) |
Newtown Wellington 6021 |
02 May 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Birch, Stuart John Individual |
Newtown Wellington 6021 |
09 Apr 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Houpt, Stephanie Joan Individual |
Newtown Wellington 6021 |
09 Apr 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Teachin Agency.com Pty Ltd Other (Other) |
Collingwood Victoria 3066 |
31 Jul 2019 - current |
Companybox Limited Level 2, 50 The Terrace |
|
Poyo Corporate Trustee Limited Level 4, 1 Woodward Street |
|
Calavrias Trustee Limited Level 5, 10 Brandon Street |
|
Reliant Services Limited C/-28 Cambridge Tce |
|
Vintan Developments Limited Level 1 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
Emp-fhm Investments No.2 Limited Level 14, 45 Johnston Street |
Infinity Learn Limited 1 Queens Wharf |
Okc New Zealand Limited Level 3 |
Maths Adventures Limited 4/240 The Terrace |
Learning Adventures New Zealand Limited Flat 4, 240 The Terrace |
Pixelhouse Limited 181 Glenmore Street |
Interlead Consultants Limited 15 Moana Road |