Piers Anderson Medical Practice Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037910587) was launched on 02 Mar 1998. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 43 Moore Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 (type: physical, registered). 2 Seymour Road, Howick, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 01 Nov 1999. Piers Anderson Medical Practice Limited used other names, namely: Aes Computers Limited from 27 May 1998 to 27 May 1998, Aes Computers Limited (02 Mar 1998 to 27 May 1998). 100 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 99 shares (99 per cent of shares), namely:
Anderson, Michael Piers Romaine (an individual) located at Half Moon Bay, Auckland,
Anderson, Sally Alison (an individual) located at Half Moon Bay, Auckland,
Graham, Rhonda Margot (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland 1050. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Anderson, Michael Piers Romaine (an individual) - located at Half Moon Bay, Auckland. The Businesscheck data was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
43 Moore Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Physical & registered & service | 01 Nov 1999 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Piers Romaine Anderson
Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 01 Feb 2006 |
Director | 18 May 1998 - current |
Sally Alison Anderson
Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 01 Feb 2006 |
Director | 18 May 1998 - current |
Garth Osmond Melville
Ponsonby, Auckland,
Address used since 02 Mar 1998 |
Director | 02 Mar 1998 - 18 May 1998 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2 Seymour Road, Howick, Auckland | Physical & registered | 01 Nov 1999 - 01 Nov 1999 |
C/- 85 College Hill, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered | 01 Nov 1999 - 01 Nov 1999 |
C/- 85 College Hill, Ponsonby, Auckland | Physical & registered | 04 Jun 1998 - 01 Nov 1999 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Michael Piers Romaine Individual |
Half Moon Bay Auckland |
02 Mar 1998 - current |
Anderson, Sally Alison Individual |
Half Moon Bay Auckland |
02 Mar 1998 - current |
Graham, Rhonda Margot Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
02 Mar 1998 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Michael Piers Romaine Individual |
Half Moon Bay Auckland |
02 Mar 1998 - current |
Howick House Physiotherapy And Nutrition Limited 43 Moore Street |
|
Remmerswaal Trustee Company Limited Fencible Chambers |
|
Blue Enamel Limited 4/37 Moore Street |
|
Eastland Trustee Company Limited Fencible Chambers |
|
Galbraiths Trustee Company Limited Fencible Chambers |
|
Health Aid Chinese Medicine Limited 41 Moore Street |