Dalton Management Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429037957469) was launched on 19 Nov 1997. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 7 Surville Place, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 7 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 18 Sep 2017. Dalton Management Limited used other aliases, namely: Creswell Holdings Limited from 19 Nov 1997 to 22 Dec 2020. 500 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 250 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Gerrett, David Anthony (an individual) located at Mairangi Bay, Auckland postcode 0630. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (250 shares); it includes
Gerrett, Patricia May (an individual) - located at Mairangi Bay, Auckland. Our information was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Surville Place, Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Sep 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Anthony Gerrett
Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 17 Sep 2015 |
Director | 19 Nov 1997 - current |
Patricia May Gerrett
Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 17 Sep 2015 |
Director | 19 Nov 1997 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 7 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical & registered | 25 Sep 2015 - 18 Sep 2017 |
Level 1, 7 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, North Shore City 0630 | Physical & registered | 16 Sep 2009 - 25 Sep 2015 |
1st Floor, 7 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland | Registered & physical | 15 Sep 2005 - 16 Sep 2009 |
C/- Robinson & Running, Chartered Accountants, 7 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland | Registered | 29 Oct 2003 - 15 Sep 2005 |
C/- Robinson & Running, Chartered Accountants, 7 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland | Physical | 29 Sep 2003 - 15 Sep 2005 |
1st Floor, 7 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland | Registered | 29 Sep 2003 - 29 Oct 2003 |
1st Floor, 7 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland | Physical | 29 Sep 2003 - 29 Sep 2003 |
7 Amante Crescent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 29 Sep 2003 |
7 Amante Crescent, Mairangi Bay, Auckland | Physical | 19 Nov 1997 - 29 Sep 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gerrett, David Anthony Individual |
Mairangi Bay Auckland 0630 |
19 Nov 1997 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gerrett, Patricia May Individual |
Mairangi Bay Auckland 0630 |
19 Nov 1997 - current |
Brookby Enterprises Limited 22 Surville Place |
|
Dreham Limited 8 Surville Place |
|
Simply Editing Limited 20 Surville Place |
|
Daystar Books Limited 20 Surville Place |
|
Belding Computing Devices Limited 20 Surville Place |
|
Daystar Publications Charitable Trust 20 Surville Place |