Cinderfaud Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038035012) was launched on 18 Aug 1997. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 4C Sefton Street East, Timaru, Timaru, 7910 (type: registered, physical). 55 Theodosia Street, Timaru had been their physical address, up until 07 Nov 2018. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 10 shares (10% of shares), namely:
Hide, Ashley Thomas (an individual) located at Linwood, Christchurch postcode 8062. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 90% of all shares (exactly 90 shares); it includes
Johnston, Paul Alexander (an individual) - located at Gleniti, Timaru 7910,
Hide, Ashley Thomas (an individual) - located at Linwood, Christchurch. The Businesscheck database was updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
4c Sefton Street East, Timaru, Timaru, 7910 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Nov 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ashley Thomas Hide
Linwood, Christchurch, 8062
Address used since 09 Jul 2021
Clifton, Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 17 Jul 2008 |
Director | 18 Aug 1997 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
55 Theodosia Street, Timaru, 7910 | Physical & registered | 31 Jul 2012 - 07 Nov 2018 |
C/-paul Johnston, 55 Theodosia Street, Timaru | Registered & physical | 07 Aug 2006 - 31 Jul 2012 |
Paul Johnston, Chartered Accountant, 57a Theodosia Street, Timaru | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 07 Aug 2006 |
Paul Johnston, Chartered Accountant, 57a Theodosia Street, Timaru | Physical | 19 Aug 1997 - 07 Aug 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hide, Ashley Thomas Individual |
Linwood Christchurch 8062 |
18 Aug 1997 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Johnston, Paul Alexander Individual |
Gleniti Timaru 7910 |
18 Aug 1997 - current |
Hide, Ashley Thomas Individual |
Linwood Christchurch 8062 |
18 Aug 1997 - current |
Klifden Limited 57a Theodosia Street |
|
Yonder.co.nz Limited 57a Theodosia Street |
|
G.b. Timaru Limited 57a Theodosia Street |
|
Aerialtech Limited 57a Theodosia Street |
|
South Canterbury Morris Minor Club Incorporated 57a Theodosia Street |
|
South Canterbury Mountain Bike Club Incorporated C/o Mitchell Mccleary |