Queenstown Bungy Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429038057847) was registered on 23 Jun 1997. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Po Box 488, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9348 (type: postal, office). 173 Spey Street, Invercargill had been their physical address, up to 17 Jun 2015. 1000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Bungy New Zealand Limited (an entity) located at Invercargill postcode 9810. "Bungy jump operation" (business classification R913910) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Queenstown Bungy Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Registered & physical & service | 17 Jun 2015 |
Po Box 488, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9348 | Postal | 02 Oct 2019 |
209 Glenda Drive, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 | Office | 02 Oct 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Henry Van Asch
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 14 Jun 2010 |
Director | 23 Jun 1997 - current |
Paul Henry Drury Van Asch
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 14 Jun 2010 |
Director | 23 Jun 1997 - current |
Andrew Winston Brinsley
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 01 Jun 2011 |
Director | 11 Aug 2008 - current |
Richard Bruce Golding Mehrtens
Rd1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 17 Feb 2016 |
Director | 17 Feb 2016 - current |
Neil Douglas Johnston
Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302
Address used since 17 Feb 2016 |
Director | 17 Feb 2016 - current |
Wendy Mary Pannett
Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 26 Jun 2023 |
Director | 26 Jun 2023 - current |
Michael John Davies
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 07 Jun 2012 |
Director | 11 Aug 2008 - 17 Feb 2016 |
Jacqueline Leigh Morgan Davies
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 25 Oct 2011 |
Director | 25 Oct 2011 - 17 Feb 2016 |
John Francis Ward
Rosedale, Invercargill, 9810
Address used since 14 Jun 2010 |
Director | 07 Apr 2000 - 30 Nov 2015 |
Anthony Charles Russell Hannon
Waiake, Auckland,
Address used since 30 Jun 2005 |
Director | 30 Jun 2005 - 08 Jun 2008 |
Christopher Shaun Dunphy
Epsom, Auckland,
Address used since 04 Jul 1997 |
Director | 04 Jul 1997 - 20 Mar 2000 |
209 Glenda Drive , Frankton , Queenstown , 9300 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Physical & registered | 15 Jun 2012 - 17 Jun 2015 |
Whk South, 62 Deveron Street, Invercargill, 9812 | Registered & physical | 17 Nov 2010 - 15 Jun 2012 |
Whk Coook Adam Ward Wilson, 62 Deveron Street, Invercargill | Registered | 16 Jun 2008 - 17 Nov 2010 |
Whk Cook Adam Ward Wilson, 62 Deveron Street, Invercargill | Physical | 16 Jun 2008 - 17 Nov 2010 |
C/- Ward Wilson Ltd, 10 Athol Street, Queenstown | Registered & physical | 26 May 2003 - 16 Jun 2008 |
2 Pompallier Terrace, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 26 May 2003 |
2 Pompallier Terrace, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered | 20 Jun 1999 - 11 Apr 2000 |
2 Pompallier Terrace, Ponsonby, Auckland | Physical | 20 Jun 1999 - 20 Jun 1999 |
Ward Wilson, 9 Shotover Street, Queenstown | Physical | 20 Jun 1999 - 26 May 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bungy New Zealand Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039360045 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Invercargill 9810 |
23 Jun 1997 - current |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Bungy New Zealand Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 423093 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Schist Holdings Limited 173 Spey Street |
|
Northern Southland Engineering Limited 173 Spey Street |
|
Symonds Street Trust Services Limited 173 Spey Street |
|
Turntru Machining Limited 173 Spey Street |
|
N J Architectural Design Limited 173 Spey Street |
|
Ronaki (southland) Limited 173 Spey Street |
Bungy New Zealand Ventures Limited 173 Spey Street |
Huka Falls Zipline Limited 100 Karamu Road North |
Velocity Valley Limited 25 Fryer Road |
Canyon Adventures Limited 28 Poike Road |
Rocket U NZ Limited 11 Alexander Street |
Shotover Canyon Swing Limited Level 2, 45 Camp Street |