Foster & Co Trustees No. 1 Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429038062483) was launched on 20 Jun 1997. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Unit 30, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (type: registered, service). 187A Pakuranga Road, Pakuranga, Manukau 2010 had been their physical address, up to 18 Sep 2012. Foster & Co Trustees No. 1 Limited used more aliases, namely: Foster & Co Trustees Limited from 20 Jun 1997 to 23 Feb 2005. 1 share is issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Foster, Glenn Clifford (an individual) located at East Tamaki, Auckland postcode 2013. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 11, 135 Cryers Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Sep 2012 |
Unit 30, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & service | 21 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Glenn Clifford Foster
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 13 Sep 2023
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 05 Mar 2020
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 10 Sep 2012 |
Director | 20 Jun 1997 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
187a Pakuranga Road, Pakuranga, Manukau 2010 | Physical & registered | 19 Sep 2008 - 18 Sep 2012 |
C/- Stanford Foster Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 187 Pakuranga Road, Pakuranga | Registered & physical | 09 Sep 2003 - 19 Sep 2008 |
Gc Foster, Chartered Accountant, 187 Pakuranga Road, Pakuranga | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 09 Sep 2003 |
Gc Foster, Chartered Accountant, 187 Pakuranga Road, Pakuranga | Physical | 24 Jun 1997 - 09 Sep 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Foster, Glenn Clifford Individual |
East Tamaki Auckland 2013 |
20 Jun 1997 - current |
Foster & Co Trustees No. 5 Limited Unit 11, 135 Cryers Road |
|
Bedpost New Zealand Limited Unit 11, 135 Cryers Road |
|
Foster & Co Trustees No. 4 Limited Unit 11, 135 Cryers Road |
|
Buxton Builders Limited Unit 11, 135 Cryers Road |
|
Entire Consultants Limited Unit 11, 135 Cryers Road |
|
Heat Seekers Limited Unit 11, 135 Cryers Road |