Alborn Enterprises Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429038095498) was started on 02 May 1997. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 29 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 (type: physical, registered). C/- Milnes Beatson Ltd, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka had been their registered address, until 05 Nov 2012. 200000 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100000 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Alborn, Sandra Yvonne (an individual) located at R D 2 Motueka postcode 7197. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 25% of all shares (exactly 50000 shares); it includes
Alborn, Gavin Craig (an individual) - located at Motueka,
Harding-Alborn, Zoe Michelle (an individual) - located at Motueka. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (50000 shares, 25%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Alborn, Johnna Maree, located at Riwaka, R D 3 Motueka (an individual),
Alborn, Brendan Peter, located at Riwaka, R D 3 Motueka (an individual). Businesscheck's database was updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
29 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Nov 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sandra Yvonne Alborn
R D 2 Motueka, 7197
Address used since 26 Oct 2012 |
Director | 02 May 1997 - current |
Gavin Craig Alborn
Motueka, 7197
Address used since 03 Jul 2018
Motueka, 7197
Address used since 03 Jul 2018 |
Director | 03 Jul 2018 - current |
Brendan Peter Alborn
Rd 3, Motueka, 7198
Address used since 03 Jul 2018 |
Director | 03 Jul 2018 - current |
Peter Norman Alborn
R D 2 Motueka, 7197
Address used since 26 Oct 2012 |
Director | 02 May 1997 - 09 May 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/- Milnes Beatson Ltd, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 | Registered | 24 Feb 2012 - 05 Nov 2012 |
C/o Milnes Beatson Ltd, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka | Physical | 17 Sep 2008 - 05 Nov 2012 |
C/o Milnes Beatson Ltd, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka | Registered | 17 Sep 2008 - 24 Feb 2012 |
Hames Pickett & Co, Chartered Accountants, 52 High Street, Waipawa | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 17 Sep 2008 |
Hames Pickett & Co, Chartered Accountants, 52 High Street, Waipawa | Registered | 10 Nov 1999 - 11 Apr 2000 |
52 High Street, Waipawa | Physical | 02 May 1997 - 17 Sep 2008 |
Hames Pickett & Co, Chartered Accountants, 52 High Street, Waipawa | Physical | 02 May 1997 - 02 May 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alborn, Sandra Yvonne Individual |
R D 2 Motueka 7197 |
02 May 1997 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alborn, Gavin Craig Individual |
Motueka 7197 |
21 Nov 2008 - current |
Harding-alborn, Zoe Michelle Individual |
Motueka 7197 |
21 Nov 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alborn, Johnna Maree Individual |
Riwaka R D 3 Motueka 7198 |
21 Nov 2008 - current |
Alborn, Brendan Peter Individual |
Riwaka R D 3 Motueka 7198 |
21 Nov 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alborn, Peter Norman Individual |
R D 2 Motueka 7197 |
02 May 1997 - 07 Aug 2018 |
Blackenbrook Wines Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Tasman Gowland Surveyors Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Kaiteriteri Kayaks Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Plant Barn Propagators Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
The Pink Cider Press Co Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Ocean View Holiday Park Limited 29 Wallace Street |