Firth Dairylands Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429038095818) was started on 12 May 1997. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 25 Willoughby Street, Paeroa (type: registered, physical). Lynch & Partners, 25 Willoughby Street, Paeroa had been their registered address, until 12 Apr 2000. 2000 shares are allocated to 7 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 599 shares (29.95 per cent of shares), namely:
Firth, Rosalind (an individual) located at Rd 2, Paeroa postcode 3672,
Ptm (5034) Limited (an entity) located at Paeroa, Paeroa postcode 3600. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 20 per cent of all shares (exactly 400 shares); it includes
Firth, Rosemary (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Paeroa,
Firth, Brendan James (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Paeroa. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (400 shares, 20%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Firth, Catherine Roseanne, located at Rd 1, Paeroa (an individual),
Firth, Joshua Ryan, located at Rd 1, Paeroa (an individual). Our information was updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
25 Willoughby Street, Paeroa | Service & physical | 13 May 1997 |
25 Willoughby Street, Paeroa | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kevin Graham Firth
Rd 2, Paeroa, 3672
Address used since 18 Jul 2023
R D, Paeroa, 3640
Address used since 18 Apr 2016 |
Director | 12 May 1997 - current |
Joshua Ryan Firth
Rd 1, Paeroa, 3671
Address used since 10 Jul 2023 |
Director | 10 Jul 2023 - current |
Brendan James Firth
Rd 2, Paeroa, 3672
Address used since 10 Jul 2023 |
Director | 10 Jul 2023 - current |
Rosalind Firth
Rd 2, Paeroa, 3672
Address used since 10 Jul 2023 |
Director | 10 Jul 2023 - current |
David John Firth
R D, Paeroa, 3640
Address used since 18 Apr 2016 |
Director | 12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Rosaland Firth
R D, Paeroa, 3640
Address used since 18 Apr 2016 |
Director | 12 May 1997 - 01 Oct 2019 |
Linda Athalie Firth
R D, Paeroa, 3640
Address used since 18 Apr 2016 |
Director | 12 May 1997 - 01 Oct 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Lynch & Partners, 25 Willoughby Street, Paeroa | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 12 Apr 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Firth, Rosalind Individual |
Rd 2 Paeroa 3672 |
18 Jul 2023 - current |
Ptm (5034) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041885154 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Paeroa Paeroa 3600 |
01 Mar 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Firth, Rosemary Individual |
Rd 2 Paeroa 3672 |
18 Jul 2023 - current |
Firth, Brendan James Individual |
Rd 2 Paeroa 3672 |
18 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Firth, Catherine Roseanne Individual |
Rd 1 Paeroa 3671 |
18 Jul 2023 - current |
Firth, Joshua Ryan Individual |
Rd 1 Paeroa 3671 |
18 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Firth, Rosalind Individual |
Rd 2 Paeroa 3672 |
18 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Firth, Kevin Graham Individual |
R D Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Firth, Kevin Graham Individual |
Rd 2 Paeroa 3672 |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Firth, Kevin Graham Individual |
Rd 2 Paeroa 3672 |
18 Jul 2023 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Firth, Kevin Graham Individual |
Rd 2 Paeroa 3672 |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Paeroa Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038949692 Company Number: 556654 Entity |
09 Dec 2022 - 09 Dec 2022 | |
Firth, Rosalind Individual |
R D Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Firth, Rosaland Individual |
R D Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Firth, Rosaland Individual |
R D Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Firth, Kevin Graham Individual |
R D Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Firth, David John Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Firth, David John Individual |
R D Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Firth, David John Individual |
R D Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Firth, David John Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
12 May 1997 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Van De Wetering, Martin William Individual |
Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 01 Mar 2017 |
Firth, Linda Individual |
Rd 2 Paeroa 3672 |
09 Dec 2022 - 09 Dec 2022 |
Firth, Linda Athalie Individual |
R D Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 09 Dec 2022 |
Firth, Linda Athalie Individual |
R D Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 09 Dec 2022 |
Firth, Linda Athalie Individual |
R D Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 09 Dec 2022 |
Van De Wetering, Martin William Individual |
Paeroa |
12 May 1997 - 01 Mar 2017 |
Luckie Property Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
|
Lyngary Farm Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
|
O`hara Construction Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
|
Surfside Property Holdings Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
|
Profarm Investments Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
|
Arquette Investments Limited 25 Willoughby Street |