N W N Z Co Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038152665) was registered on 12 Feb 1997. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 4, 5-7 Kingdon St, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, registered). Level 3, 139 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 14 Apr 2015. 1 share is issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 1 share (100% of shares), namely:
Stewart, Claire Andrea (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071,
Mcgregor, Hamish Roderick (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071. "Business consultant service" (business classification M696205) is the classification the ABS issued to N W N Z Co Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 5-7 Kingdon St, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered & service | 14 Apr 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Claire Andrea Stewart
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 14 Feb 2024
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 24 May 2013 |
Director | 01 Mar 1998 - current |
Hamish Roderick Mcgregor
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 14 Feb 2024
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 24 May 2013 |
Director | 29 May 1998 - current |
Leigh Francis Cockerill
Grey Lynn, Auckland,
Address used since 12 Feb 1997 |
Director | 12 Feb 1997 - 01 Mar 1998 |
24 Paunui St , St Heliers , Auckland , 1071 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 139 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 29 Mar 2011 - 14 Apr 2015 |
Level 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered & physical | 29 Jun 2007 - 29 Mar 2011 |
Wilson Partners Ltd, 3047 Great North Road, New Lynn, Auckland | Physical | 26 Apr 2001 - 29 Jun 2007 |
Wilson Somerville, 7 Rata Street, New Lynn, Auckland | Registered | 26 Apr 2001 - 29 Jun 2007 |
7 Rata Street, New Lynn | Physical | 26 Apr 2001 - 26 Apr 2001 |
C/- Grant Thornton, Chartered, Accountants, Level 5, Elders House, 60 Khyber Pass Rd, Grafton Auckland | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 26 Apr 2001 |
C/- Grant Thornton, Chartered, Accountants, Level 5, Elders House, 60 Khyber Pass Rd, Grafton Auckland | Physical | 21 May 1999 - 26 Apr 2001 |
C/- Grant Thornton, Chartered, Accountants, Level 5, Elders House, 60 Khyber Pass Rd, Grafton Auckland | Registered | 12 Mar 1999 - 11 Apr 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stewart, Claire Andrea Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
12 Feb 1997 - current |
Mcgregor, Hamish Roderick Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
12 Feb 1997 - current |
Arnott's New Zealand Limited Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent |
|
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Your Property Services Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Grovers Investments Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
Kewa Holdings Limited Level 2, 5-7 Kingdon Street |
Maa Pharma Consulting Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
Hideaway Inc Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
Chand & Associates Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
Coriolis Impact Limited Level 6, 130 Broadway |
Adze Value Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |