Forsite International Limited (NZBN 9429038175336) was registered on 23 Dec 1996. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 38C Northway Street, Te Rapa, Hamilton, 3200 (type: physical, registered). 38C Northway Street, Te Rapa, Hamilton had been their registered address, until 15 Nov 2019. Forsite International Limited used other aliases, namely: Forest Systems N.z. Limited from 23 Dec 1996 to 30 Nov 2017. 20000 shares are allotted to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 9999 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Sharp, Angela Mary (an individual) located at Ngaruawahia, Ngaruawahia postcode 3793,
Robertson Fulton Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Whitiora, Hamilton postcode 3200. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (9999 shares); it includes
Robertson Fulton Trustees Limited (an entity) - located at Whitiora, Hamilton,
Sharp, Rodney Warwick (an individual) - located at Ngaruawahia, Ngaruawahia. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.01%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Sharp, Rodney Warwick, located at Ngaruawahia, Ngaruawahia (an individual). "Sales agent for manufacturer or wholesaler" (ANZSIC F380050) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Forsite International Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 29 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
38c Northway Street, Te Rapa, Hamilton, 3200 | Physical & registered & service | 15 Nov 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rodney Warwick Sharp
Ngaruawahia, Ngaruawahia, 3793
Address used since 07 Nov 2016 |
Director | 23 Dec 1996 - current |
Angela Mary Sharp
Ngaruawahia, Ngaruawahia, 3793
Address used since 02 Nov 2017
Ngaruawahia, Ngaruawahia, 3793
Address used since 07 Nov 2016 |
Director | 23 Dec 1996 - current |
Warwick Bruce Batley
Tirau,
Address used since 23 Dec 1996 |
Director | 23 Dec 1996 - 09 Mar 2010 |
Malcolm Thomas Buckley
Tokoroa,
Address used since 23 Dec 1996 |
Director | 23 Dec 1996 - 30 Oct 1999 |
38c Northway Street , Te Rapa , Hamilton , 3200 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
38c Northway Street, Te Rapa, Hamilton, 3200 | Registered & physical | 16 Nov 2016 - 15 Nov 2019 |
23 Thomson Avenue, Dinsdale, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical | 18 Nov 2010 - 16 Nov 2016 |
C/-a Sharp, 23 Thomson Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Physical & registered | 24 Sep 2010 - 18 Nov 2010 |
C/- G W Scott & Associates, 23 Empire Street, Cambridge | Physical & registered | 20 Mar 2002 - 24 Sep 2010 |
Balmoral Drive, Tokoroa | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 20 Mar 2002 |
Balmoral Drive, Tokoroa | Physical | 24 Dec 1996 - 20 Mar 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharp, Angela Mary Individual |
Ngaruawahia Ngaruawahia 3793 |
29 Nov 2004 - current |
Robertson Fulton Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036962846 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whitiora Hamilton 3200 |
23 Sep 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Robertson Fulton Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036962846 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whitiora Hamilton 3200 |
23 Sep 2010 - current |
Sharp, Rodney Warwick Individual |
Ngaruawahia Ngaruawahia 3793 |
29 Nov 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharp, Rodney Warwick Individual |
Ngaruawahia Ngaruawahia 3793 |
23 Dec 1996 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharp, Angela Mary Individual |
Ngaruawahia Ngaruawahia 3793 |
23 Dec 1996 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cousins, Alan Lindsay Individual |
Hamilton |
29 Nov 2004 - 23 Sep 2010 |
Batley, Warwick Bruce Individual |
Tirau |
23 Dec 1996 - 23 Sep 2010 |
Cousins, Alan Lindsay Individual |
Hamilton |
29 Nov 2004 - 23 Sep 2010 |
Progressive Ip Limited 38c Northway Street |
|
Progressive Equipment Limited 38c Northway Street |
|
Progressive Hydraulics Limited 38c Northway Street |
|
Progressive Machining Limited 38c Northway Street |
|
Metrology Techniques Limited 30 Northway Street |
|
Midland Tool & Gauge Limited 30 Northway Street |
Progressive Ip Limited 38c Northway Street |
Spraytech New Zealand Limited 6/671 Te Rapa Road |
Alta Global Business Limited 22c Sunshine Ave |
Urban Consulting Limited 123 Te Pamahue Drive |
Coombes Johnston European (tauranga) Limited 497 Te Rapa Road |
United Supply Group Limited 16 Chartwell Crescent |