Gco Fuels Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038185403) was started on 05 Dec 1996. 8 addresess are in use by the company: Unit 404, 43A Gillies Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, service). 4 Banff Avenue, Epsom, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 02 Aug 2022. Gco Fuels Limited used more names, namely: Rdg Consultants Limited from 05 Dec 1996 to 17 Feb 2005. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Gabb, Rodney Donald (an individual) located at Epsom, Auckland postcode 1023. "Petroleum product wholesaling (including product ownership to retail point-of-sale)" (business classification F332130) is the category the ABS issued Gco Fuels Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
142 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 01 Apr 2020 |
4 Banff Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 03 Mar 2021 |
4 Banff Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered | 11 Mar 2021 |
4 Banff Avenue, Epsom, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & service | 02 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rodney Gabb
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 27 Mar 2023
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 01 Apr 2020
Albany Heights, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 17 Mar 2016
Newmarket, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 28 Mar 2019 |
Director | 05 Dec 1996 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
4 Banff Avenue, Epsom, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & service | 02 Aug 2022 |
Unit 404, 43a Gillies Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Shareregister | 09 Mar 2024 |
Unit 404, 43a Gillies Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & service | 18 Mar 2024 |
4 Banff Avenue , Epsom , Auckland , 1023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4 Banff Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical | 11 Mar 2021 - 02 Aug 2022 |
142 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 20 Mar 2018 - 11 Mar 2021 |
11 Hardley Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 | Registered & physical | 26 Apr 2017 - 20 Mar 2018 |
24 Anzac Parade, Hamilton East, Hamilton, 3216 | Physical & registered | 11 Mar 2016 - 26 Apr 2017 |
24 Bridge Street, Hamilton East, Hamilton, 3216 | Registered & physical | 02 Jun 2009 - 11 Mar 2016 |
Deloitte, Fonterra House, 80 London St, Hamilton | Registered & physical | 16 Apr 2004 - 02 Jun 2009 |
Deloitte Touch Tohmatsu, 5th Floor, Anchor House, 80 London Street, Hamilton | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 16 Apr 2004 |
Deloitte Touch Tohmatsu, 5th Floor, Anchor House, 80 London Street, Hamilton | Physical | 06 Dec 1996 - 16 Apr 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gabb, Rodney Donald Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
05 Dec 1996 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gabb, Dalila Individual |
Remuera Auckland |
07 Apr 2004 - 07 Apr 2004 |
Aotea Independent Trustees Limited 142 Broadway |
|
300 Queen Street Limited 142 Broadway |
|
Sgbr Trustees Limited 142 Broadway |
|
Fi Properties Limited Level 2 |
|
Moores International Limited Level 3, Dorchester House |
|
Fasttrack Automotive Compliance 2006 Limited Level 2 |
Excel Petrol Limited Level 6/135 Broadway |
Pmf Manufacturing Limited 95b Kohimarama Road |
Microbe Technologies Limited 23 Banks Road |
Srt Motorsport Limited 60 Mauku Road |
Jr Distributors Limited 24c Alpito Place |
Waitomo Petroleum Limited 3 Ellis Street |