Evander Farms Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429038209307) was started on 29 Oct 1996. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 65 Kennedy Road, Rd 2, Dairy Flat, 0792 (type: physical, service). Level 1, 7 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland had been their physical address, until 25 Oct 2018. Evander Farms Limited used more names, namely: Long Bay Livestock Limited from 29 Oct 1996 to 21 Nov 1996. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Green, Gerard Joseph Buckley (an individual) located at Rd 2, Albany postcode 0792. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Green, Catherine Maree (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Albany. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
65 Kennedy Road, Rd 2, Dairy Flat, 0792 | Physical & service & registered | 25 Oct 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Catherine Maree Green
Rd 2, Albany, 0792
Address used since 20 Oct 2011 |
Director | 29 Oct 1996 - current |
Gerard Joseph Buckley Green
Rd 2, Albany, 0792
Address used since 20 Oct 2011 |
Director | 29 Oct 1996 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 7 Anzac Road, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical & registered | 31 Oct 2011 - 25 Oct 2018 |
Hugh Green Group, First Floor, 107 Neilson Street, Onehunga, Auckland | Registered & physical | 03 Nov 2003 - 31 Oct 2011 |
Hush Green Group, First Floor, 107 Neilson Street, Onehunga, Auckland | Physical & registered | 02 Sep 2002 - 03 Nov 2003 |
Pricewaterhousecoopers, Level 8 Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 29 Apr 2002 - 02 Sep 2002 |
26 Mays Street, Devonport, Auckland 1309 | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 29 Apr 2002 |
26 Mays Street, Devonport, Auckland 1309 | Physical | 16 Dec 1996 - 16 Dec 1996 |
Price Waterhouse, 66 Wyndham Street, Auckland | Physical | 16 Dec 1996 - 29 Apr 2002 |
26 Mays Street, Devonport, Auckland 1309 | Registered | 06 Dec 1996 - 11 Apr 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Green, Gerard Joseph Buckley Individual |
Rd 2 Albany 0792 |
29 Oct 1996 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Green, Catherine Maree Individual |
Rd 2 Albany 0792 |
29 Oct 1996 - current |
P C Fraser Trustees Limited Level 1, 7 Anzac Road |
|
Hamlet Trustee Limited Level 1, 7 Anzac Road |
|
Novator 6 Limited Level 1, 7 Anzac Road, |
|
Shajean Limited Level 1, 7 Anzac Road |
|
Boston Belles Investments Limited Browns Bay |
|
Robinson & Running Limited Level 1, 7 Anzac Road |