Health & Safety Services Nz Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038272288) was launched on 14 Aug 1996. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 26 Virginia Ave, Eden Tce, Auckland (type: physical, registered). 26 Virginia Avenue, Eden Terrace, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 01 Oct 2003. 7000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 7000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Ocs Group Nz Limited (an entity) located at Eden Terrace, Auckland postcode 1021. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
26 Virginia Ave, Eden Tce, Auckland | Physical & registered & service | 01 Oct 2003 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ling Ling Wong
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 10 Jun 2015 |
Director | 10 Jun 2015 - current |
Gareth Wesley Marriott
Perth, Wa, 6000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Perth, Wa, 6000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Berwick, Victoria, 3806
Address used since 13 Apr 2016
Belmont Wa, 6104
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Berwick, Victoria, 3806
Address used since 23 Mar 2020 |
Director | 11 Dec 2015 - current |
Gavin George Upston
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 12 Oct 2016 |
Director | 12 Oct 2016 - 18 Apr 2018 |
Rory John Crout
St Ives, Nsw, 2075
Address used since 06 Dec 2017
Perth Wa, 6000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 06 Dec 2017 - 17 Apr 2018 |
Warren William Webb
Twin Waters, Queensland, 4564
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Twin Waters, Queensland, 4564
Address used since 24 Jun 2016 |
Director | 24 Jun 2016 - 16 Mar 2018 |
Jane Elizabeth Sheard
Mosman, Sydney, Nsw, 2088
Address used since 08 Aug 2016
Perth, Wa, 6000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Perth, Wa, 6000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 29 Apr 2016 - 24 Nov 2017 |
Steven Mace
Cronulla, Nsw, 2230
Address used since 11 Dec 2015
Perth, Wa, 6000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Perth, Wa, 6000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 11 Dec 2015 - 01 May 2016 |
Andrew Lum
Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 07 Aug 2015 |
Director | 30 Jun 2006 - 29 Apr 2016 |
James Alexander Fletcher
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 11 Apr 2012 |
Director | 11 Apr 2012 - 05 May 2015 |
Kevin John Mulcahy
Rd 3 Albany, Auckland, 0793
Address used since 15 Aug 2011 |
Director | 06 Jun 2006 - 22 Jun 2012 |
Travis Michael Mcgrath
Ponsonby, Auckland,
Address used since 11 Dec 2003 |
Director | 11 Dec 2003 - 06 Jun 2006 |
Raymond Andrew Yanko
Palm Beach, Waiheke,
Address used since 03 Jan 2001 |
Director | 03 Jan 2001 - 11 Dec 2003 |
Diann Margaret Thompson
Palm Beach, Waiheke,
Address used since 23 Aug 1999 |
Director | 23 Aug 1999 - 03 Jan 2001 |
Barry Reid
Hobsonville, Auckland,
Address used since 14 Aug 1996 |
Director | 14 Aug 1996 - 23 Aug 1999 |
David Campbell
Ruakaka,
Address used since 14 Aug 1996 |
Director | 14 Aug 1996 - 23 Aug 1999 |
Leigh Charles Dodd
Maunu, Whangarei,
Address used since 14 Aug 1996 |
Director | 14 Aug 1996 - 23 Aug 1999 |
Shane David Culham
Glenbervie,
Address used since 14 Aug 1996 |
Director | 14 Aug 1996 - 23 Aug 1999 |
William Nixon Boustead
Raumanga, Whangarei,
Address used since 14 Aug 1996 |
Director | 14 Aug 1996 - 23 Apr 1999 |
Ross Cochrane
Ngunguru,
Address used since 14 Aug 1996 |
Director | 14 Aug 1996 - 18 Mar 1998 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
26 Virginia Avenue, Eden Terrace, Auckland | Registered | 29 Aug 2000 - 01 Oct 2003 |
90 Purirri Park Road, Mauna, Whangarei | Physical | 29 Aug 2000 - 29 Aug 2000 |
Golsling Chapman Centre, 8th Floor, 63 Albert Street, Auckland | Physical | 29 Aug 2000 - 01 Oct 2003 |
31 Te Hape Road, R D 9, Whangarei | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 29 Aug 2000 |
90 Puriri Park Road, Maunu, Whangarei | Registered | 01 Oct 1999 - 11 Apr 2000 |
31 Te Hape Road, R D 9, Whangarei | Physical | 20 Aug 1998 - 29 Aug 2000 |
31 Te Hape Road, R D 9, Whangarei | Registered | 29 Aug 1997 - 01 Oct 1999 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ocs Group NZ Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036122660 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Eden Terrace Auckland 1021 |
07 Jun 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thompson, Diann Margaret Individual |
Palm Beach Waiheke |
14 Aug 1996 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Mcgrath, Travis Michael Individual |
Ponsonby Auckland |
18 Aug 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Effective Date | 31 Aug 2021 |
Name | O.c.s. Group Limited |
Type | Private Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1298292 |
Country of origin | GB |
Sanitaire NZ Limited Suite 4, 26 Virginia Avenue |
|
Ocs Group NZ Limited Ocs Group NZ Limited |
|
Moriah Holdings Limited 25 Virginia Avenue |
|
Savill Coordinates Limited 25 Virginia Avenue |
|
Whyte Family Trustee Company Limited 4 Minnie Street |
|
The Print Guys Limited The Print Guys Limited |