Lane Associates Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038285134) was started on 02 Jul 1996. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: L4, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, registered). Level 4, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland had been their registered address, until 17 Mar 2017. 1000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.1% of shares), namely:
Lane, Jacqueline Hannah (an individual) located at Mount Dandenong, Vic postcode 3767. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 49.9% of all shares (exactly 499 shares); it includes
Lane, Cherie-Ann (an individual) - located at Stanley Point, Auckland. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Lane, Natalie Ellen, located at Lake Hawea (an individual). Our information was updated on 24 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
L4, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 17 Mar 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Cherie-ann Lane
Stanley Point, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 09 May 2014 |
Director | 02 Jul 1996 - current |
Malcolm Robert Lane
Stanley Point, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 09 May 2014 |
Director | 02 Jul 1996 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 21 Mar 2012 - 17 Mar 2017 |
Grant Thornton New Zealand Ltd, Level 4,152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 19 Mar 2010 - 21 Mar 2012 |
Grant Thornton Auckland Limited, Level 4,152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 29 Jun 2009 - 19 Mar 2010 |
Grant Thornton Auckland Limited, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 23 Oct 2007 - 29 Jun 2009 |
Grant Thornton Auckland Limited, 97-101 Hobson Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 26 Mar 2004 - 23 Oct 2007 |
60 Callipoe Road, Devonport, Auckland | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 26 Mar 2004 |
18 Domain Street, Devonport, Auckland 9 | Registered | 24 May 1999 - 11 Apr 2000 |
97-101 Hobson Street, Auckland 1 | Physical | 24 May 1999 - 26 Mar 2004 |
18 Domain Street, Devonport, Auckland 9 | Physical | 24 May 1999 - 24 May 1999 |
60 Callipoe Road, Devonport, Auckland | Registered & physical | 30 Aug 1997 - 24 May 1999 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lane, Jacqueline Hannah Individual |
Mount Dandenong Vic 3767 |
12 Mar 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lane, Cherie-ann Individual |
Stanley Point Auckland 0624 |
19 Mar 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lane, Natalie Ellen Individual |
Lake Hawea 9382 |
12 Mar 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lane, Cherie-ann Individual |
Stanley Point Auckland 0624 |
02 Jul 1996 - 19 Mar 2024 |
Gilbert, Murray Ashley Individual |
Stanley Point Auckland 0624 |
02 Jul 1996 - 19 Mar 2024 |
Lane, Malcolm Robert Individual |
Stanley Point Auckland 0624 |
02 Jul 1996 - 19 Mar 2024 |
Lane, Malcolm Robert Individual |
Stanley Point Auckland 0624 |
02 Jul 1996 - 19 Mar 2024 |
Lane, Malcolm Robert Individual |
Stanley Point Auckland 0624 |
02 Jul 1996 - 19 Mar 2024 |
Lane, Cherie-ann Individual |
Stanley Point Auckland 0624 |
02 Jul 1996 - 19 Mar 2024 |
Gummerson Fabrics Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
|
Red Eagle Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
|
Pioneer Capital Ii Nominees Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
|
Pioneer Capital Ii Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
|
Pioneer Capital (gp Ii) Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |
|
Epi-use New Zealand Limited L4, 152 Fanshawe Street |