T W Computer Brokers Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038293054) was launched on 12 Jun 1996. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 7 Loughros Place, Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 (type: office, registered). 99A Arran Road, Browns Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, until 12 Jun 2012. 240 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 120 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Wong, Tony (an individual) located at Pinehill, Auckland postcode 0632. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 120 shares); it includes
Doo, Thomas Wong (an individual) - located at Orakei, Auckland. "Computer retailing" (business classification G422210) is the classification the ABS issued T W Computer Brokers Limited. Our data was updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Loughros Place, Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 | Office | unknown |
7 Loughros Place, Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Jun 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomas Wong Doo
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 12 Jun 1996 |
Director | 12 Jun 1996 - current |
Tony Wong
Pinehill, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 02 Jun 2012 |
Director | 12 Jun 1996 - current |
7 Loughros Place , Pinehill , Auckland , 0632 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
99a Arran Road, Browns Bay, Auckland | Registered & physical | 17 Jun 2010 - 12 Jun 2012 |
9 David Beattie Place, Chatswood, Auckland | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 17 Jun 2010 |
12 Paora St, Orakei, Auckland | Physical | 11 Jul 1997 - 17 Jun 2010 |
9 David Beattie Place, Chatswood, Auckland | Physical | 11 Jul 1997 - 11 Jul 1997 |
9 David Beattie Place, Chatswood, Auckland | Registered | 10 Jul 1997 - 10 Jul 1997 |
12 Paora Street, Orakei, Auckland | Registered | 10 Jul 1997 - 11 Apr 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wong, Tony Individual |
Pinehill Auckland 0632 |
12 Jun 1996 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Doo, Thomas Wong Individual |
Orakei Auckland |
12 Jun 1996 - current |
Laser Innovations Limited 7 Loughros Place |
|
Gfs Studio Limited 13 Loughros Place |
|
Webtop Ecommerce Solution Limited 16 Kilear Close |
|
4s Property Solutions Limited 26 Loughros Place |
|
Sok Victory Limited 8 Loughros Place |
|
Yichuan Investments Limited 24 Kilear Close |
Kiwi Pearls Limited 606 East Coast Road |
Wei Group Limited 9c Orbit Drive |
Brontobyte Limited 29 Matipo Road |
Kiwidigi Limited Shop 2, Block C4, Cornerstone Drive |
Eponymous Limited 1010 East Coast Road |
Mirental Limited Suite B1, 2b William Pickering Drive |