Wellesley Property Holdings Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429038300486) was launched on 10 Jun 1996. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Level 5, 38 Waring Taylor St, Wellington, 6010 (type: physical, registered). Level 10, 38 Waring Taylor St, Wellington had been their registered address, up to 31 Mar 2016. Wellesley Property Holdings Limited used other aliases, namely: The Wellesley Limited from 24 Mar 1999 to 17 Feb 2004, Blucher Resources Limited (10 Jun 1996 to 24 Mar 1999). 3161088 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 3161088 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
The Thorndon Group Limited (an entity) located at 38 Waring Taylor St, Wellington postcode 6011. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 14 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 5, 38 Waring Taylor St, Wellington, 6010 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 21 Mar 2016 |
Level 5, 38 Waring Taylor St, Wellington, 6010 | Physical & registered & service | 31 Mar 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Wayne Sydney Coffey
Wellington, 6011
Address used since 21 Mar 2016 |
Director | 09 Oct 1997 - current |
Brent Sidney Coffey
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 07 Mar 2022
Thorndon, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 27 Apr 2008 |
Director | 27 Apr 2008 - current |
Kevin Richard Hing
Northland, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 29 Apr 2010 |
Director | 09 Oct 1997 - 01 Mar 2022 |
Alan David Tanner
Tairua, Coromandel, 3544
Address used since 21 Mar 2016 |
Director | 09 Oct 1997 - 01 Mar 2022 |
Anthony Arthur Paul Willy
Rd 2, Blenheim,
Address used since 06 Dec 2007 |
Director | 06 Dec 2007 - 04 Mar 2015 |
John David Hawkins
Sefton, R D 2, Rangiora,
Address used since 16 Feb 2001 |
Director | 16 Feb 2001 - 06 Mar 2014 |
Graeme Richard Holmes
Wellington,
Address used since 13 Feb 2008 |
Director | 13 Feb 2008 - 22 Apr 2009 |
Quentin Morris Hay
Kelburn, Wellington,
Address used since 13 Feb 2008 |
Director | 13 Feb 2008 - 24 Dec 2008 |
Alan Max Blakey
Parnell, Auckland,
Address used since 09 Oct 1997 |
Director | 09 Oct 1997 - 27 Apr 2008 |
Andrew Forbes Davidson
Christchurch,
Address used since 09 Oct 1997 |
Director | 09 Oct 1997 - 31 Aug 2007 |
Timothy Paul Blindell
Karori, Wellington,
Address used since 09 Oct 1997 |
Director | 09 Oct 1997 - 06 Jun 2007 |
John Gregory Tuohy
Karori, Wellington,
Address used since 30 Nov 2005 |
Director | 30 Nov 2005 - 30 Nov 2005 |
Richard John James Perham
Lower Hutt,
Address used since 09 Oct 1997 |
Director | 09 Oct 1997 - 15 Mar 2000 |
George Denby Domett
Ngaio, Wellington,
Address used since 10 Jun 1996 |
Director | 10 Jun 1996 - 09 Oct 1997 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 10, 38 Waring Taylor St, Wellington, 6010 | Registered & physical | 15 Aug 2011 - 31 Mar 2016 |
L5, 105 Customhouse Quay, Wellington 6011 | Registered & physical | 29 Apr 2009 - 15 Aug 2011 |
2-8 Maginnity Street, Wellington | Physical | 06 Mar 2009 - 29 Apr 2009 |
2-8 Maginnity Street, Wellington | Physical | 29 Apr 2008 - 06 Mar 2009 |
C/-pocock Hudson, Level 7, 44 Victoria Street, Wellington | Physical | 29 Apr 2008 - 29 Apr 2008 |
2-8 Maginnity Street, Wellington | Registered | 29 Apr 2008 - 29 Apr 2009 |
C/-pocock Hudson, Level 7, 44 Victoria Street, Wellington | Registered | 07 May 2007 - 29 Apr 2008 |
C/-pocock Hudson Limited, Level 7, 44 Victoria Street, Wellington | Physical | 07 May 2007 - 29 Apr 2008 |
C/- Bdo Hogg Young Cathie, 99-105 Customhouse Quay, Wellington | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 07 May 2007 |
The Offices Of New Zealand Timber, Indusdtry Federation Incorporated, 219 Thorndon Quay, Wellington | Registered | 01 Jun 1998 - 11 Apr 2000 |
C/- Bdo Hogg Young Cathie, 99-105 Customhouse Quay, Wellington | Physical | 01 Jun 1998 - 01 Jun 1998 |
2-8 Maginnity Street, Wellington | Physical | 01 Jun 1998 - 07 May 2007 |
C/- Bdo Hogg Young Cathie, 99-105 Customhouse Quay, Wellington | Registered | 10 Dec 1997 - 01 Jun 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Thorndon Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040905617 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
38 Waring Taylor St Wellington 6011 |
20 Dec 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Thorndon Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040905617 Company Number: 18474 Entity |
10 Jun 1996 - 02 Jul 2007 | |
Wellesley Club Incorporated Company Number: 217046 Entity |
08 Nov 2005 - 05 Oct 2007 | |
The Northern Timber Association Incorporated Company Number: 221651 Entity |
10 Jun 1996 - 08 Nov 2005 | |
The Northern Timber Association Incorporated Company Number: 221651 Entity |
10 Jun 1996 - 08 Nov 2005 | |
Waterloo Ventures Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033544564 Company Number: 1918814 Entity |
06 Jun 2007 - 20 Dec 2012 | |
The Thorndon Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040905617 Company Number: 18474 Entity |
10 Jun 1996 - 02 Jul 2007 | |
Waterloo Ventures Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033544564 Company Number: 1918814 Entity |
06 Jun 2007 - 20 Dec 2012 | |
New Zealand Timber Industry Fed Inc Other |
10 Jun 1996 - 06 Jun 2007 | |
Wellesley Club Incorporated Company Number: 217046 Entity |
08 Nov 2005 - 05 Oct 2007 | |
Null - New Zealand Timber Industry Fed Inc Other |
10 Jun 1996 - 06 Jun 2007 |
Name | The Thorndon Group Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 18474 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 5 38 Waring Taylor St Wellington 6011 |
Dalman Physiotherapy Limited Level 7, Pethrick Tower |
|
Nash & Lloyd Osteopaths Limited Level 3, Petherick Tower |
|
Wellington Family Law Limited 38 Waring Taylor Street |
|
Woodmark Limited Level 5 |
|
Woodmark Ip Limited L5 |
|
Wellesley Group Limited Level 5 |