Kilburn Properties (No 1) Limited (NZBN 9429038322174) was incorporated on 23 May 1996. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 53 Valley Road, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 (type: registered, service). 395A Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland had been their physical address, until 24 Sep 2020. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 500 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
No. 7 Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Matters, Linda Anne (a director) located at Rd 1, Waiheke Island postcode 1971. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 28 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 17 Great South Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1051 | Physical & registered & service | 24 Sep 2020 |
53 Valley Road, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 | Registered & service | 22 Jul 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Brett Anthony Kilburn
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 29 Jul 2016 |
Director | 23 May 1996 - current |
Linda Anne Matters
Rd 1, Waiheke Island, 1971
Address used since 28 Sep 2015 |
Director | 28 Sep 2015 - current |
Kevin Garry Walker
Oneroa, Waiheke Island, 1081
Address used since 13 Feb 2012 |
Director | 31 Aug 2009 - 30 Sep 2015 |
Joyce Patricia Kilburn
St Heliers, Auckland,
Address used since 18 Jun 2007 |
Director | 23 May 1996 - 31 Jul 2007 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
395a Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 24 May 2016 - 24 Sep 2020 |
Level 3, 12 Kent Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 07 Apr 2015 - 24 May 2016 |
684 Great South Road, Manukau City, Manukau 2104 | Registered & physical | 21 Jan 2009 - 07 Apr 2015 |
685 Great South Road, Manukau City, Manukau 2104 | Registered & physical | 28 May 2008 - 21 Jan 2009 |
686 Great South Road, Manukau City | Registered & physical | 15 Feb 2006 - 28 May 2008 |
142 West Coast Road, Glen Eden | Registered | 28 Feb 2001 - 15 Feb 2006 |
125 West Coast Road, Glen Eden, Auckland | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 28 Feb 2001 |
125 West Coast Road, Glen Eden, Auckland | Registered | 21 Oct 1999 - 11 Apr 2000 |
125 West Coast Road, Glen Eden, Auckland | Physical | 21 Oct 1999 - 21 Oct 1999 |
142 West Coast Road, Glen Eden, Auckland | Physical | 21 Oct 1999 - 21 Oct 1999 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
No. 7 Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041666456 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
07 Oct 2015 - current |
Matters, Linda Anne Director |
Rd 1 Waiheke Island 1971 |
07 Oct 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kilburn, Joyce Patricia Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
23 May 1996 - 13 May 2021 |
Walker, Kevin Garry Individual |
Oneroa Waiheke Island 1081 |
18 Aug 2010 - 07 Oct 2015 |
Kilburn, Joyce Patricia Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
23 May 1996 - 13 May 2021 |
Kilburn, Joyce Patricia Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
23 May 1996 - 13 May 2021 |
Kilburn, Joyce Patricia Individual |
Glenbrook Auckland 2681 |
23 May 1996 - 13 May 2021 |
Kilburn, Brett Anthony Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
23 May 1996 - 13 May 2021 |
Kilburn, Brett Anthony Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
23 May 1996 - 13 May 2021 |
Karaka & Puriri Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031250757 Company Number: 3242237 Entity |
30 May 2011 - 07 Oct 2015 | |
Matters-walker, Linda Anne Individual |
Rd 1 Waiheke Island 1971 |
18 Aug 2010 - 07 Oct 2015 |
Macdonald, Marcus Arthur Individual |
Greenhithe North Shore City 0632 |
18 Aug 2010 - 30 May 2011 |
Kilburn, Brett Anthony Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
23 May 1996 - 13 May 2021 |
Karaka & Puriri Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031250757 Company Number: 3242237 Entity |
30 May 2011 - 07 Oct 2015 | |
Kilburn, Brett Anthony Individual |
Glenbrook Auckland |
23 May 1996 - 13 May 2021 |
Sports Lab Rehabilitation Limited 395a Manukau Road |
|
Keith Mcleod Electrical Limited 371 Manukau Road |
|
The Healing Company Limited 371 Manukau Road |
|
Sg1 Enterprises Limited 371 Manukau Road |
|
K A Lindberg Limited 371 Manukau Road |
|
Head Held High Limited 371 Manukau Road |