The New Zealand Home Loan Company Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429038356032) was started on 18 Apr 1996. 8 addresess are in use by the company: 903 Victoria Street, Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204 (type: office, postal). 903 Victoria Street, Hamilton had been their registered address, up until 09 Jan 2023. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Kiwi Group Capital Limited (an entity) located at Wellington postcode 6011. The Businesscheck data was updated on 24 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
903 Victoria Street, Hamilton Central, Hamilton, 3204 | Office | unknown |
903 Victoria Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Physical | 26 Feb 2018 |
Po Box 3240, Waikato Mail Centre, Hamilton, 3240 | Postal | 16 Nov 2020 |
903 Victoria Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Delivery | 16 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Monique Bridget Cairns
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 15 May 2018 |
Director | 15 May 2018 - current |
Richard Gordon Alexander Westlake
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 01 Feb 2019 |
Director | 01 Feb 2019 - current |
Kirsty Mary Campbell
Birkenhead, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 01 Aug 2019 |
Director | 01 Aug 2019 - current |
Robert William Smith
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Aug 2019 |
Director | 01 Aug 2019 - current |
Graeme William Watt
Seatoun, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 14 Jun 2013 |
Director | 14 Jun 2013 - 31 Aug 2019 |
Mark Edward Wilkshire
Woburn, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 14 Nov 2016 |
Director | 14 Nov 2016 - 11 Feb 2019 |
Neil Andrew Richardson
Whangamata, 3620
Address used since 26 Feb 2013 |
Director | 01 Oct 2002 - 31 Dec 2018 |
Philip Louis Harris
Chartwell, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 14 Nov 2016 |
Director | 14 Nov 2016 - 18 Dec 2018 |
Nicholas John Astwick
Whitby, Porirua, 5024
Address used since 05 Oct 2010 |
Director | 05 Oct 2010 - 15 Feb 2017 |
Mark James Stephen
Ngaio, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 01 Jul 2011 |
Director | 01 Jul 2011 - 26 Jun 2015 |
Gordon William Davidson
Silverstream, Upperhutt, Wellington,
Address used since 16 Dec 2008 |
Director | 16 Dec 2008 - 05 Apr 2013 |
John Charles Erkkila
R D 3, Hamilton,
Address used since 18 Apr 1996 |
Director | 18 Apr 1996 - 02 Jul 2012 |
Paul Robert Brock
Boulcott, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 05 Oct 2010 |
Director | 05 Oct 2010 - 02 Jul 2012 |
Peter Meggison
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 14 Feb 2011 |
Director | 14 Feb 2011 - 01 Jul 2011 |
Helen Mary Hatchard
Khandallah, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 05 Oct 2010 |
Director | 05 Oct 2010 - 24 Mar 2011 |
Ian Samuel Knowles
Wellington, 6012
Address used since 01 Jul 2006 |
Director | 01 Jul 2006 - 05 Oct 2010 |
Helen Mary Hatchard
Khandallah, Wellington,
Address used since 01 Aug 2008 |
Director | 01 Aug 2008 - 16 Dec 2008 |
Craig Holden Stuart
Upper Hutt,
Address used since 01 Jul 2006 |
Director | 01 Jul 2006 - 27 Jul 2008 |
Murray Ferguson
Hamilton,
Address used since 18 Apr 1996 |
Director | 18 Apr 1996 - 18 Feb 2005 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
30 Ponsonby Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1011 | Registered & service | 09 Jan 2023 |
Po Box 147509, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1144 | Postal | 03 Apr 2023 |
Level 2, 30 Ponsonby Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1011 | Office & delivery | 03 Apr 2023 |
903 Victoria Street , Hamilton Central , Hamilton , 3204 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
903 Victoria Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & service | 26 Feb 2018 - 09 Jan 2023 |
24 Anzac Parade, Hamilton East, Hamilton, 3216 | Physical & registered | 07 Mar 2017 - 26 Feb 2018 |
24 Bridge Street, Hamilton East, Hamilton, 3216 | Physical & registered | 20 May 2009 - 07 Mar 2017 |
Deloitte., Fonterra House, 80 London Street, Hamilton | Registered & physical | 22 Aug 2007 - 20 May 2009 |
11th Floor, 85 Alexander Street, Hamilton | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 22 Aug 2007 |
11th Floor, 85 Alexander Street, Hamilton | Registered | 29 Jul 1998 - 11 Apr 2000 |
Kpmg, 11th Fl, Kpmg Centre, 85 Alexander Street, Hamilton | Physical | 18 Apr 1996 - 22 Aug 2007 |
11th Floor, 85 Alexander Street, Hamilton | Physical | 18 Apr 1996 - 18 Apr 1996 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kiwi Group Capital Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050981540 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Wellington 6011 |
09 May 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Richardson, Neil Andrew Individual |
Hamilton |
18 Apr 1996 - 09 Jul 2012 |
Ferguson, Murray Individual |
Hamilton |
18 Apr 1996 - 05 Aug 2004 |
Kiwi Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032307696 Company Number: 2228732 Entity |
Wellington 6011 |
05 Aug 2009 - 09 May 2023 |
Kiwibank Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036917211 Company Number: 1135352 Entity |
14 Feb 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Harkness Henry Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038206504 Company Number: 833081 Entity |
05 Aug 2004 - 09 Jul 2012 | |
Kiwibank Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036917211 Company Number: 1135352 Entity |
14 Feb 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Harkness Henry Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038206504 Company Number: 833081 Entity |
05 Aug 2004 - 09 Jul 2012 | |
Fletcher, Robert Bruce Individual |
Hamilton |
05 Aug 2004 - 09 Jul 2012 |
Harris, Alison Mary Individual |
Chartwell Hamilton 3210 |
05 Aug 2004 - 09 Jul 2012 |
Erkkila, John Charles Individual |
R D 3 Hamilton |
18 Apr 1996 - 09 Jul 2012 |
Null - Harkness Henry Trust Management Limited Other |
18 Apr 1996 - 05 Aug 2004 | |
Null - Mckinnon Trust Management Limited Other |
18 Apr 1996 - 05 Aug 2004 | |
Nwm Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037004040 Company Number: 1116509 Entity |
05 Aug 2004 - 09 Jul 2012 | |
Nwm Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037004040 Company Number: 1116509 Entity |
05 Aug 2004 - 09 Jul 2012 | |
Mckinnon Trust Management Limited Other |
18 Apr 1996 - 05 Aug 2004 | |
Harkness Henry Trust Management Limited Other |
18 Apr 1996 - 05 Aug 2004 | |
Harris, Philip Louis Individual |
Chartwell Hamilton 3210 |
18 Apr 1996 - 09 Jul 2012 |
Name | Kiwi Group Holdings Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 2228732 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
New Zealand Post House 7 Waterloo Quay Wellington 6011 |
Advance Roofing Limited At Registered Office |
|
The Nar Foundation Level 1 |
|
Nutrition Care 2008 Limited Level 8, Westpac House |
|
Baldock Rentals Limited 867 Victoria Street |
|
Liquid Trustee Limited 867 Victoria Street |
|
Profile Electrical Limited 867 Victoria Street |