Bakers Delight (Nz) Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429038422706) was incorporated on 22 Sep 1995. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: Unit 8, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 (type: registered, service). Ground Floor, Princes Court, 2 Princes Street, Auckland had been their physical address, until 11 Jul 2022. 2415586 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 1932464 shares (80% of shares), namely:
Frewin, Bentyn James (a director) located at Rd 2, Clevedon postcode 2582,
Frewin, Lucinda Jane (an individual) located at Rd 2, Clevedon postcode 2582,
Davenports Harbour Trustee (2012) Limited (an entity) located at Albany, Auckland postcode 0632. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20% of all shares (exactly 483120 shares); it includes
Notman, Craig Stuart Richardson (an individual) - located at Pukekohe. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Frewin, Lucinda Jane, located at Rd 2, Clevedon (an individual). "Bread vending" (business classification G412920) is the category the ABS issued to Bakers Delight (Nz) Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 31 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
E4/123 Ormiston Road, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 | Registered & physical & service | 11 Jul 2022 |
Unit 8, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Office | 07 Apr 2023 |
Unit 8, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & service | 18 Apr 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Craig Stuart Richardson Notman
Pukekohe, 2677
Address used since 05 Dec 2022
Pukekohe, Puni, 2678
Address used since 30 Jun 2022 |
Director | 30 Jun 2022 - current |
Bentyn James Frewin
Rd 2, Clevedon, 2582
Address used since 30 Jun 2022 |
Director | 30 Jun 2022 - current |
Roger George Gillespie
Camberwell, Vic, 3124
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Hawthorn, V I C 3122,
Address used since 22 Sep 1995 |
Director | 22 Sep 1995 - 30 Jun 2022 |
Lesley Joy Gillespie
Camberwell, Vic, 3124
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Hawthorn, Victoria 3122,
Address used since 31 Jan 2006 |
Director | 07 Dec 1998 - 30 Jun 2022 |
David Philip Hunter Christie
Hawthorn East, Victoria, 3123
Address used since 02 Oct 2018
Camberwell, Victoria, 3124
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 02 Oct 2018 - 30 Jun 2022 |
Hamish Andrew Ross
Hampton, Melbourne, Victoria, 3188
Address used since 01 Aug 2021
Camberwell, Victoria, 3123
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Brighton, Melbourne, Victoria, 3186
Address used since 01 Jul 2020 |
Director | 01 Jul 2020 - 30 Jun 2022 |
Barry Ross Brownjohn
Palm Beach, Nsw, 2108
Address used since 13 Nov 2015
Camberwell, Vic, 3124
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 07 Dec 1998 - 17 Nov 2015 |
Braeden Stephen Lord
Richmond, Victoria 3121, Australia,
Address used since 07 Dec 1998 |
Director | 07 Dec 1998 - 28 Sep 2007 |
Lyle Edward Turner
Narre Warren East, Victoria, Vic 3804, Australia,
Address used since 22 Sep 1995 |
Director | 22 Sep 1995 - 31 Dec 1998 |
Brent Leslie Giles
Auckland,
Address used since 22 Sep 1995 |
Director | 22 Sep 1995 - 24 Feb 1997 |
Alexander Roman Bojczuk
Camberwell, V I C 3124, Australia,
Address used since 22 Sep 1995 |
Director | 22 Sep 1995 - 12 Nov 1996 |
E4/123 Ormiston Road , Flat Bush , Auckland , 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Ground Floor, Princes Court, 2 Princes Street, Auckland, 1140 | Physical & registered | 20 Jul 2021 - 11 Jul 2022 |
Ground Floor, Princes Court, 2 Princes Street, Auckland, 1140 | Physical & registered | 04 Sep 2020 - 20 Jul 2021 |
36 Enfield Street, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Physical & registered | 28 Mar 2013 - 04 Sep 2020 |
Central Park Business Centre, Bldg 5, Level 6, 666 Great South Rd, Greenlane, Auckland, 1544 | Registered & physical | 24 Nov 2006 - 28 Mar 2013 |
Suite 2, Level 2, 626 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland | Physical & registered | 09 Dec 2003 - 24 Nov 2006 |
C/- Erns & Young, National Mutual Building, 37-41 Shortland Street, Auckland | Registered | 27 Nov 1997 - 09 Dec 2003 |
6th Floor, 369 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 27 Nov 1997 - 09 Dec 2003 |
C/- Erns & Young, National Mutual Building, 37-41 Shortland Street, Auckland | Physical | 27 Nov 1997 - 27 Nov 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Frewin, Bentyn James Director |
Rd 2 Clevedon 2582 |
30 Jun 2022 - current |
Frewin, Lucinda Jane Individual |
Rd 2 Clevedon 2582 |
30 Jun 2022 - current |
Davenports Harbour Trustee (2012) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030858626 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
30 Jun 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Notman, Craig Stuart Richardson Individual |
Pukekohe 2677 |
30 Jun 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Frewin, Lucinda Jane Individual |
Rd 2 Clevedon 2582 |
30 Jun 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Frewin, Bentyn James Director |
Rd 2 Clevedon 2582 |
30 Jun 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bakers Delight Holdings Limited Other |
Camberwell Vic 3124 Australia |
22 Sep 1995 - 30 Jun 2022 |
Bakers Delight Holdings Limited Other |
Camberwell Vic 3124 Australia |
22 Sep 1995 - 30 Jun 2022 |
Name | Bakers Delight Holdings Ltd |
Type | Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 52528202 |
Country of origin | AU |
Address |
Level 1, 293 Camberwell Road Camberwell Vic 3124 |
Primesite Properties (1998) Limited Suite 1, 29 Enfield Street |
|
Primesite Properties (fitzherbert St) Limited Suite 1, 29 Enfield Street |
|
Prime Site Properties Limited Suite 1, 29 Enfield Street |
|
Acland Holdings Limited 18 Normanby Road |
|
Envivo Limited 1st Floor, 18 Normanby Road |
|
Citta Limited 18 Normanby Road |
Tnz Link Limited 24a La Veta Avenue |
G & H Trading Limited 13 Dunkineely Road |
Vohra Meharveen Limited 168a Motatau Road |