Westridge Farm Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429038427848) was started on 27 Oct 1995. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 17-19 John Street, Balclutha, 9230 (type: registered, service). C/- Hayward Mcauslan & Co, 20 James Street, Balclutha had been their physical address, up to 04 Mar 2013. 10000 shares are allotted to 10 shareholders who belong to 6 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 4000 shares (40 per cent of shares), namely:
Hm Nominees Limited (an entity) located at Balclutha postcode 9230,
Anderson, Kathleen Alice (an individual) located at Rd 2, Wanaka postcode 9382,
Anderson, Tony Hugh (an individual) located at Rd 2, Wanaka postcode 9382. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 5 per cent of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Anderson, Mark Ryan (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Clinton. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (500 shares, 5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Anderson, Kathleen Alice, located at Lake Hawea, Wanaka (an individual). Our data was last updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
17-19 John Street, Balclutha, 9230 | Physical & service & registered | 04 Mar 2013 |
17-19 John Street, Balclutha, 9230 | Registered & service | 28 Feb 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Tony Hugh Anderson
Rd 2, Wanaka, 9382
Address used since 08 Mar 2016 |
Director | 27 Oct 1995 - current |
Mark Ryan Anderson
Rd 2, Clinton, 9584
Address used since 18 May 2021 |
Director | 18 May 2021 - current |
Kathleen Alice Anderson
Lake Hawea, Wanaka, 9382
Address used since 08 Mar 2016 |
Director | 27 Oct 1995 - 18 May 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/- Hayward Mcauslan & Co, 20 James Street, Balclutha | Physical & registered | 27 Oct 1995 - 04 Mar 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hm Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036067688 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Balclutha 9230 |
11 Dec 2018 - current |
Anderson, Kathleen Alice Individual |
Rd 2 Wanaka 9382 |
10 Jun 2009 - current |
Anderson, Tony Hugh Individual |
Rd 2 Wanaka 9382 |
10 Jun 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Mark Ryan Individual |
Rd 2 Clinton 9584 |
19 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Kathleen Alice Individual |
Lake Hawea Wanaka 9382 |
27 Oct 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Tony Hugh Individual |
Lake Hawea Wanaka 9382 |
27 Oct 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Tony Hugh Individual |
Rd 2 Wanaka 9382 |
10 Jun 2009 - current |
Anderson, Mark Ryan Individual |
Rd 2 Clinton 9584 |
19 Aug 2014 - current |
Anderson, Kathleen Alice Individual |
Lake Hawea Wanaka 9382 |
27 Oct 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderson, Madeline Fiona Individual |
Rd 2 Clinton 9584 |
19 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcauslan, Lee Individual |
Rd 1 Outram 9073 |
10 Jun 2009 - 11 Dec 2018 |
Th & Sl Duncan Limited 17-19 John Street |
|
Nathan Craig Hedgecutting Limited 17-19 John Street |
|
Glenfalloch Gorge Limited 17 - 19 John Street |
|
Otanomomo Station Limited 17-19 John Street |
|
Maguire Engineering Milton Limited 17 John Street |
|
Hm Nominees (2012) Limited 17-19 John Street |