Mitchel Commercial Limited (NZBN 9429038434716) was incorporated on 20 Sep 1995. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 75 Viewmont Drive, Harbour View, Lower Hutt, 5010 (type: registered, physical). 29 A Wakefield Street, Alicetown, Lower Hutt had been their registered address, until 31 Oct 2019. Mitchel Commercial Limited used other aliases, namely: Wellington Vehicle Compliance Limited from 20 Sep 1995 to 29 May 2019. 100000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Cooper, Owen Leslie (an individual) located at Harbour View, Lower Hutt postcode 5010. Our database was last updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
75 Viewmont Drive, Harbour View, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered & physical & service | 31 Oct 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Owen Leslie Cooper
Lower Hutt, Wellington, 5010
Address used since 07 Aug 2015
Lower Hutt, Wellington, 5010
Address used since 08 Aug 2017 |
Director | 20 Sep 1995 - current |
Sharon Rose Cooper
Upper Hutt,
Address used since 20 Sep 1995 |
Director | 20 Sep 1995 - 13 Aug 1999 |
James Lawrence Paulden
Christchurch 1,
Address used since 20 Sep 1995 |
Director | 20 Sep 1995 - 20 Sep 1995 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
29 A Wakefield Street, Alicetown, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered & physical | 15 Aug 2018 - 31 Oct 2019 |
17-21 Rutherford Street, Lower Hutt | Registered & physical | 03 Sep 2009 - 15 Aug 2018 |
C/-cranefield & Associates, 47a Buick Street, Petone | Physical | 19 Aug 2004 - 03 Sep 2009 |
C/- Cranefield & Associates, Petone Professional Chambers, Ground Floor, 45 Buick Street, Petone | Registered | 29 Apr 1996 - 03 Sep 2009 |
C/- Cranefield & Associates, Petone Professional Chambers, Ground Floor, 45 Buick Street, Petone | Physical | 20 Sep 1995 - 19 Aug 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cooper, Owen Leslie Individual |
Harbour View Lower Hutt 5010 |
20 Sep 1995 - current |
Bookmarque Limited 25 Rutherford St. |
|
The Victory Christian Ministries 445 High Street |
|
Victory Christian Centre 445 High Street |
|
International Convention Of Faith Ministries Of New Zealand And The Pacific Islands Trust 445 High Street |
|
Vic Property Trust 445 High Street |
|
Daily Bakery High Street Limited 463 High Street |