A Doube Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429038446306) was started on 17 Jul 1995. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 10 Hillcrest Road, Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216 (type: registered, physical). 10 Hillcrest Road, Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216 had been their registered address, up until 02 Aug 2011. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Doube, Alan (an individual) located at Hamilton. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 29 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
10 Hillcrest Road, Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216 | Service & physical | 10 Dec 2009 |
10 Hillcrest Road, Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216 | Registered | 02 Aug 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alan Doube
Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216
Address used since 03 Dec 2009 |
Director | 17 Jul 1995 - current |
Dennis Mitchell Johns
Hamilton,
Address used since 02 Oct 1995 |
Director | 02 Oct 1995 - 03 Mar 2004 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
10 Hillcrest Road, Hillcrest, Hamilton, 3216 | Registered | 10 Dec 2009 - 02 Aug 2011 |
Nick Kosoof & Associates, 110 Thomas Road, Rototuna, Hamilton | Physical & registered | 11 Sep 2006 - 10 Dec 2009 |
Nick Kosoof & Associates, Garden Place, 126 Main Street, Huntly | Registered & physical | 07 Dec 2005 - 11 Sep 2006 |
Nick Kosoof & Associates, Rimu House, 40 Main Street, Huntly | Registered | 07 Dec 2004 - 07 Dec 2005 |
Nick Kosoof & Associates, Rimu House, 40 Main Street, Huntly | Physical | 16 Nov 2004 - 07 Dec 2005 |
B D O Spicers Hamilton Ltd, 1st Floor, B, D O Bldg, Cnr Rostrevor & Harwood, Streets, Hamilton | Registered | 08 Dec 2003 - 07 Dec 2004 |
B D O Spicers Hamilton Ltd, 1st Floor, B, D O Bldg, Cnr Rostrevor & Harwood, Streets, Hamilton | Physical | 08 Dec 2003 - 16 Nov 2004 |
Spicer & Oppenheim, 1st Floor Hugh, Monckton Trust Bldg, Cnr Rostrevor &, Harwood Streets, Hamilton | Registered | 30 Nov 2001 - 08 Dec 2003 |
Spicer & Oppenheim, 1st Floor Hugh, Monckton Trust Bldg, Cnr Rostrevor &, Harwood Streets, Hamilton | Physical | 17 Jul 1995 - 17 Jul 1995 |
Bdo Spicers Hamilton Ltd, 1st Floor Hugh, Monckton Trust Bldg, Cnr Rostrevor &, Harwood Streets, Hamilton | Physical | 17 Jul 1995 - 08 Dec 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Doube, Alan Individual |
Hamilton |
03 Dec 2003 - current |
Hillcrest Bowling Club Incorporated 111 Cambridge Road |
|
Midland Education Trust C/o D.b. Dunn |
|
Tecprint Limited 87 Cambridge Road |
|
Affinity Construction Limited 19 Masters Avenue |
|
Shaylawn Limited 16 Kakanui Avenue |
|
Waikato Bay Of Plenty Branch Of The New Zealand Dental Association Incorporated 153 Cambridge Road |