Tirohanga Fruit Company Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429038455872) was incorporated on 06 Jul 1995. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 78 First Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, physical). 96 Waioweka Road, Opotiki had been their physical address, up until 29 Jun 2020. 100000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50000 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Rb, Em and Bm Sharp As Trustees Of The Puha Trust (an other) located at Opotiki postcode 3197. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25 per cent of all shares (25000 shares); it includes
Sharp, Elisabeth Maria (an individual) - located at Tirohanga, Opotiki. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (25000 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Sharp, Raymond Bruce, located at Tirohanga, Opotiki (an individual). "Kiwifruit growing" (business classification A013210) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Tirohanga Fruit Company Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 28 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
918a State Highway 35, Opotiki, Opotiki, 3197 | Postal & office & delivery | 09 Sep 2019 |
78 First Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical & service | 29 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Elisabeth Maria Sharp
Rd 1, Opotiki, 3197
Address used since 10 Mar 2023
Tirohanga, Opotiki, 3197
Address used since 06 Jul 1995 |
Director | 06 Jul 1995 - current |
Raymond Bruce Sharp
Tirohanga, Opotiki, 3197
Address used since 10 Mar 2023
Tirohanga, Opotiki, 3197
Address used since 07 Jul 1995 |
Director | 06 Jul 1995 - current |
Paul Raymond Sharp
Rd 2, Opotiki, 3198
Address used since 20 Nov 2019 |
Director | 20 Nov 2019 - current |
Maria Johanna Ivy Sharp
Rd 1, Opotiki, 3197
Address used since 10 Mar 2023
Rd 1, Opotiki, 3197
Address used since 20 Nov 2019 |
Director | 20 Nov 2019 - current |
Anthony John Hawken
Ohope, Ohope, 3121
Address used since 13 Oct 2020 |
Director | 13 Oct 2020 - current |
Ross Edwin Townshend
Rd 1, Ngaruawahia, 3793
Address used since 13 Oct 2020 |
Director | 13 Oct 2020 - current |
Elly Louise Sharp
Ohope, Ohope, 3121
Address used since 10 Mar 2023 |
Director | 10 Mar 2023 - current |
918a State Highway 35 , Opotiki , Opotiki , 3197 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
96 Waioweka Road, Opotiki | Physical | 01 Oct 2009 - 29 Jun 2020 |
Sharp & Cookson, 96 Waioweka Road, Opotiki | Physical | 06 Jul 1995 - 01 Oct 2009 |
96 Waioweka Road, Opotiki | Registered | 06 Jul 1995 - 29 Jun 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rb, Em And Bm Sharp As Trustees Of The Puha Trust Other (Other) |
Opotiki 3197 |
12 Oct 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharp, Elisabeth Maria Individual |
Tirohanga Opotiki |
06 Jul 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharp, Raymond Bruce Individual |
Tirohanga Opotiki |
06 Jul 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mannes, Johanna Maria Individual |
Rd 1 Tirohanga, Opotiki |
08 Sep 2004 - 20 Sep 2011 |
Sharp, R B Individual |
Tirohanga Opotiki |
06 Jul 1995 - 12 Oct 2017 |
Sharp, E M Individual |
Tirohanga Opotiki |
06 Jul 1995 - 12 Oct 2017 |
Opil Links Co Limited 96 Waioeka Road |
|
Flaxlands Mechanical Limited 96 Waioweka Road |
|
Rangiauria Seafoods Limited 96 Waioeka Road |
|
Hikuwai Investments Limited 96 Waioweka Rd |
|
Fox Mildon Trustees Limited 96 Waioweka Road |
|
Motu Trails Bike Hire And Shuttle Service Limited 96 Waioweka Road |
Wd & Ba Orchard-farming Limited 96 Waioweka Road |
Allen Orchards Limited 96 Waioweka Road |
Hiwinui Kiwifruit (2010) Limited 96 Waioweka Rd |
W J & J S Johnston Limited 96 Waioweka Road |
Te Matai Kiwi No 4 Limited 96 Waioeka Road |
Te Matai Kiwi No 5 Limited 96 Waioeka Road |