Mardi Gras Investments Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038463846) was launched on 28 Jun 1995. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 157D Goldings Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 (type: registered, physical). 142 Logan Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe had been their registered address, until 15 Sep 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 68 shares (68% of shares), namely:
French, David George (an individual) located at Rd2, Pukekohe postcode 2677. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 32% of all shares (exactly 32 shares); it includes
Patterson, Jocelyn (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Pukekohe,
French, David George (an individual) - located at Rd2, Pukekohe. "Kiwifruit growing" (business classification A013210) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Mardi Gras Investments Limited. Our data was updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
157d Goldings Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 | Postal & office | 07 Sep 2021 |
157d Goldings Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Sep 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David George French
Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677
Address used since 07 Sep 2021
Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677
Address used since 15 Mar 2012 |
Director | 28 Jun 1995 - current |
Graham Lloyd French
Waiuku, South Auckland, 2682
Address used since 01 Oct 2015 |
Director | 30 May 2004 - 08 Apr 2016 |
Dorothy Ina French
Pukekohe,
Address used since 28 Jun 1995 |
Director | 28 Jun 1995 - 30 May 2004 |
157d Goldings Road , Rd 2 , Pukekohe , 2677 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
142 Logan Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 | Registered & physical | 23 Mar 2012 - 15 Sep 2021 |
142 Logan Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, New Zealand | Physical | 28 Nov 2006 - 28 Nov 2006 |
Logan Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe | Physical | 28 Jun 1995 - 28 Nov 2006 |
Logan Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe | Registered | 28 Jun 1995 - 23 Mar 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
French, David George Individual |
Rd2 Pukekohe 2677 |
28 Jun 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Patterson, Jocelyn Individual |
Rd 2 Pukekohe 2677 |
15 Apr 2016 - current |
French, David George Individual |
Rd2 Pukekohe 2677 |
28 Jun 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tapp, Marlene Dorothy Individual |
Rd 1 Drury 2577 |
28 Jun 1995 - 15 Apr 2016 |
French, Graham Lloyd Individual |
Waiuku |
29 Oct 2007 - 15 Apr 2016 |
French, Dorothy Ina Individual |
Rd 2 Pukekohe 2677 |
29 Oct 2007 - 15 Dec 2015 |
French, Dorothy Ina Individual |
Pukekohe |
28 Jun 1995 - 29 Oct 2007 |
French, Graham Lloyd Individual |
Pukekohe |
28 Jun 1995 - 29 Oct 2007 |
Chevron Building Limited 154 Logan Road |
|
Insitu Containers Limited 168 Logan Road |
|
Pukekohe Christian School Trustee Limited 82 Yates Road |
|
St Ives Holdings Limited 82 Yates Road |
|
Quinta Limited 210a Logan Road |
|
Nail It Chippees Limited 210c Logan Road |
Comley's Empire Limited 3 Harris St |
K.g.m. Limited 83b Ingram Road |
The Crowes Nest Limited 82 Ingram Road |
Punchbowl Growers Limited 646 Glenbrook Road |
Punchbowl Packco Limited 646 Glenbrook Road |
Punchbowl Investments Limited 646 Glenbrook Road |