S W Matthew Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038468193) was launched on 26 May 1995. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 8A William Avenue, Greenlane, Auckland, 1061 (type: physical, registered). 10 Drorke St, Onehunga had been their registered address, up until 04 May 2001. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Matthew, Stuart William (an individual) located at Mangere Bridge, Auckland postcode 2022,
King, Dylan Craig (an individual) located at Rd 1, Bombay postcode 2675,
Matthew, Stuart William (a director) located at Mangere Bridge, Auckland postcode 2022. Our information was updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
8a William Avenue, Greenlane, Auckland, 1061 | Physical & registered & service | 27 Jun 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dylan Craig King
Mangatawhiri, 2471
Address used since 16 May 2023 |
Director | 16 May 2023 - current |
Stuart William Matthew
Mangere Bridge, Auckland, 2022
Address used since 01 Jul 2019
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 25 May 2016 |
Director | 26 May 1995 - 16 May 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
10 Drorke St, Onehunga | Registered | 04 May 2001 - 04 May 2001 |
10 O'rorke St, Onehunga, Auckland | Registered | 04 May 2001 - 27 Jun 2019 |
10 O'rorke Street, Onehunga, Auckland | Physical | 27 Oct 2000 - 27 Oct 2000 |
10 Drorke St, Onehunga, Auckland | Physical | 27 Oct 2000 - 27 Oct 2000 |
10 O'rorke St, Onehunga, Auckland | Physical | 27 Oct 2000 - 27 Jun 2019 |
10 O'rorke Street, Onehunga, Auckland | Registered | 27 Oct 2000 - 04 May 2001 |
9 O'rorke Street, Onehunga, Auckland | Registered | 26 Oct 2000 - 27 Oct 2000 |
9 O'rourke Street, Onehunga, Auckland | Registered | 14 Aug 1998 - 26 Oct 2000 |
9 O'rorke Street, Onehunga, Auckland | Physical | 26 May 1995 - 27 Oct 2000 |
9 O'rourke Street, Onehunga, Auckland | Physical | 26 May 1995 - 26 May 1995 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Matthew, Stuart William Individual |
Mangere Bridge Auckland 2022 |
25 Jun 2018 - current |
King, Dylan Craig Individual |
Rd 1 Bombay 2675 |
25 Jun 2018 - current |
Matthew, Stuart William Director |
Mangere Bridge Auckland 2022 |
25 Jun 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Blackmore, Scott Richard Individual |
Mangere Bridge Auckland 2022 |
25 Jun 2018 - 03 May 2022 |
Dell, Bruce Individual |
2 Kings Road Panmure, Auckland |
26 May 1995 - 25 Jun 2018 |
Matthew, Stuart William Individual |
Onehunga Auckland |
26 May 1995 - 25 Jun 2018 |
Roy J Johnson 1979 Limited 6 O'rorke Street |
|
Hoshizaki Lancer Limited 9 O'rorke Street |
|
NZ Car Tech Limited 6a O'rorke Street |
|
Rt Importers Limited 41-43 Neilson Street |
|
Maison 39 Limited 41-43 Neilson Street |
|
Pearl River Trading Limited 7 Selwyn Street |