Key Research Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429038518973) was incorporated on 29 Mar 1995. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Anz Building, Level 1, 247 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, physical). Anz Building Level 1,, 247 Cameron Road, Tauranga had been their physical address, up until 09 Jan 2014. Key Research Limited used more aliases, namely: Key Research & Marketing Limited from 29 Mar 1995 to 16 Jun 2005. 5000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 4900 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Empire Trust Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010,
Hooker, Michael John (an individual) located at Bethlehem, Tauranga postcode 3110,
Hooker, Kirsten Joy (an individual) located at Bethlehem, Tauranga postcode 3110. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 2% of all shares (100 shares); it includes
Hooker, Michael John (an individual) - located at Bethlehem, Tauranga,
Hooker, Kirsten Joy (an individual) - located at Bethlehem, Tauranga. Our database was last updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Anz Building, Level 1, 247 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Service & physical | 09 Jan 2014 |
Anz Building, Level 1, 247 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered | 10 Feb 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael John Hooker
Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 21 Feb 2019
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 27 Mar 2013 |
Director | 16 Feb 2001 - current |
Kirsten Joy Hooker
Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 21 Feb 2019
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 27 Mar 2013 |
Director | 16 Feb 2001 - current |
Moira Louise Moroney
Mount Maunganui,
Address used since 29 Mar 1995 |
Director | 29 Mar 1995 - 16 Feb 2001 |
David George Stewart
Mt Maunganui,
Address used since 29 Mar 1995 |
Director | 29 Mar 1995 - 03 Nov 2000 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Anz Building Level 1,, 247 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical | 08 Jan 2014 - 09 Jan 2014 |
77 Maunganui Rd, Mt Maunganui | Registered | 08 Feb 2000 - 10 Feb 2014 |
42 Marine Parade, Mount Maunganui | Registered | 08 Feb 2000 - 08 Feb 2000 |
77 Maunganui Road, Mount Maunganui | Physical | 29 Mar 1995 - 08 Jan 2014 |
42 Marine Parade, Mount Maunganui | Physical | 29 Mar 1995 - 29 Mar 1995 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Empire Trust Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030797994 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
13 Aug 2013 - current |
Hooker, Michael John Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
27 Nov 2009 - current |
Hooker, Kirsten Joy Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
27 Nov 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hooker, Michael John Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
29 Mar 1995 - current |
Hooker, Kirsten Joy Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
29 Mar 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clive Gardner Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034917879 Company Number: 1606567 Entity |
04 Mar 2011 - 13 Aug 2013 | |
Clive Gardner Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034917879 Company Number: 1606567 Entity |
04 Mar 2011 - 13 Aug 2013 |
Everlink Limited 247 Cameron Road |
|
Ahipara Investments Limited 247 Cameron Road |
|
Kiwiberry Te Puke Limited 247 Cameron Road |
|
Cac Limited 247 Cameron Road |
|
Lincoln Road Food Warehouse Limited 247 Cameron Road |
|
Cameron Orchards Limited 247 Cameron Road |