Combined Properties Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429038570469) was incorporated on 21 Aug 1995. 6 addresess are in use by the company: 248 Broadway, Marton, Marton, 4710 (type: other, records). 9 Bennett Street, Papanui, Christchurch had been their registered address, up to 03 May 2007. 4428 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 2214 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Twiss, Geoffrey Francis Julian (an individual) located at St Albans, Christchurch postcode 8052,
Twiss, William Harry (an individual) located at Saint Albans, Christchurch postcode 8052. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 2214 shares); it includes
Flynn, John Phillip (an individual) - located at Miramar, Wellington. "Real estate agency service" (business classification L672010) is the category the ABS issued to Combined Properties Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
19 Scotston Avenue, St Albans, Christchurch, 8052 | Physical & registered & service | 03 May 2007 |
248 Broadway, Marton, Marton, 4710 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister & other (Address for Records) & records (Address For Share Register) | 04 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
William Harry Twiss
St Albans, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 07 Jun 2016 |
Director | 21 Aug 1995 - current |
John Phillip Flynn
Miramar, Wellington,
Address used since 21 Aug 1995 |
Director | 21 Aug 1995 - 21 Mar 2014 |
Stefan Chiet
Wanganui,
Address used since 21 Aug 1995 |
Director | 21 Aug 1995 - 31 Dec 1997 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
9 Bennett Street, Papanui, Christchurch | Registered | 24 Jun 2003 - 03 May 2007 |
C/- P R Twiss & Co, 9 Bennett Street, Papanui, Christchurch | Registered | 24 Jun 2003 - 24 Jun 2003 |
Messrs F R Twiss & Co, Solicitors, 13 Follett Street, Marton | Physical | 21 Aug 1995 - 21 Aug 1995 |
Messrs F R Twiss & Co, Solicitors, 13 Follett Street, Marton | Registered | 21 Aug 1995 - 24 Jun 2003 |
9 Bennett Street, Papanui, Christchurch | Physical | 21 Aug 1995 - 03 May 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Twiss, Geoffrey Francis Julian Individual |
St Albans Christchurch 8052 |
16 Apr 2024 - current |
Twiss, William Harry Individual |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8052 |
21 Aug 1995 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Flynn, John Phillip Individual |
Miramar Wellington 6022 |
15 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Allen, Jane Elizabeth Individual |
Riccarton Christchurch 8011 |
22 Apr 2017 - 16 Apr 2024 |
Matsis, Peter Philip Individual |
Miramar Wellington 6022 |
15 Jun 2004 - 04 May 2017 |
Flynn, Aaron Individual |
Wellington |
15 Jun 2004 - 26 Apr 2007 |
Flynn, Brian Francis Individual |
Wellington |
15 Jun 2004 - 15 Jun 2004 |
Simpson, Peter Charles Individual |
Rd 10 Ashhurst Palmerston North |
15 Jun 2004 - 17 Jul 2012 |
Szuldak, Sylvia Anna Individual |
Rd 10 Ashhurst |
15 Oct 2007 - 17 Jul 2012 |
Woodhouse, Richard Individual |
Miramar Wellington |
15 Jun 2004 - 15 Jun 2004 |
Flynn, John Patrick Individual |
Mirmar Wellington |
15 Jun 2004 - 15 Jun 2004 |
Lourie, Gail Elizabeth Individual |
Maungaraupi Marton 4787 |
21 Nov 2013 - 22 Apr 2017 |
Twiss, Philippa Individual |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8052 |
21 Aug 1995 - 21 Nov 2013 |
The Canterbury English Speaking Union Trust C/o Mr H Ryan |
|
Claremont Limited 11 Scotston Avenue |
|
Michael Sharp Consultancy Limited 24 Norfolk Street |
|
Panda Group Limited Flat 2, 35a Tomes Road |
|
Live World Limited 16 Nightingale Place |
|
Zumo Retail Limited 60 Paparoa Street |
Parklands Realty Limited 471 Papanui Road |
Parklands Real Estate Limited 471 Papanui Road |
New Brighton Realty (1998) Limited 471 Papanui Road |
Demografik Limited 112 Leinster Road |
Christchurch Real Estate Limited 4 Bounty Street |
Philip Smith Consulting Limited 11 Naseby Street |