Loisn Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038732638) was started on 08 Sep 1993. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 29 Taylors Avenue, Christchurch (type: physical, registered). 34-36 Cranmer Square, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 09 Apr 2009. 20000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 5000 shares (25% of shares), namely:
Oh, Suzanne Su Ming (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (10000 shares); it includes
Oh, Andrew Teik Kim (an individual) - located at Bryndwr, Christchurch. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (5000 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Oh, Christopher Teik Kee, located at St Heliers, Auckland (an individual). Businesscheck's information was last updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
29 Taylors Avenue, Christchurch | Physical & registered & service | 09 Apr 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Wendy Ann Oh
Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 05 Aug 2015 |
Director | 20 Mar 1998 - current |
Christopher Teik Kee Oh
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 30 Jul 2001 |
Director | 30 Jul 2001 - current |
Suzanne Su Ming Oh
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 05 Aug 2015 |
Director | 03 Dec 2002 - current |
Andrew Teik Kim Oh
Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 05 Aug 2015 |
Director | 04 Apr 1995 - 13 Nov 2015 |
Siew Nam Oh
5048 Bukit Tunku, Kaula Lumpur,
Address used since 08 Sep 1993 |
Director | 08 Sep 1993 - 20 Mar 1998 |
Margaret Lois Oh
8 Taylors Avenue, Christchurch,
Address used since 08 Sep 1993 |
Director | 08 Sep 1993 - 20 Mar 1998 |
Christopher Teik Kee Oh
Auckland,
Address used since 04 Apr 1995 |
Director | 04 Apr 1995 - 20 Mar 1998 |
Suzanne Su Ming Oh
Christchurch,
Address used since 04 Apr 1995 |
Director | 04 Apr 1995 - 20 Mar 1998 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
34-36 Cranmer Square, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 24 Oct 2008 - 09 Apr 2009 |
Hadlee Kippenberger & Partners, 34-36 Cramner Square, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 03 Aug 2007 - 24 Oct 2008 |
116 Riccarton Road, Christchurch | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 03 Aug 2007 |
5 Maydell Street, Christchurch | Registered | 28 Jun 1997 - 03 Aug 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Oh, Suzanne Su Ming Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
08 Sep 1993 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Oh, Andrew Teik Kim Individual |
Bryndwr Christchurch 8052 |
08 Sep 1993 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Oh, Christopher Teik Kee Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
08 Sep 1993 - current |
Jaz Investment Properties Limited 25 D Taylors Avenue |
|
Fresh Up Canterbury Limited 28 Taylors Avenue |
|
Finance & Equity Limited 23 Taylors Avenue |
|
Torchwood Limited 17 Chislehurst Place |
|
Kensal Investments Limited 22 Galway Avenue |
|
The Christchurch Multicultural Council Incorporated 49a Jeffreys Road |