R & S Refrigeration & Electrical Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429038752261) was started on 21 Apr 1994. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 9B Sievwright Lane, Whataupoko, Gisborne, 4010 (type: registered, service). 104 Roebuck Road, Gisborne had been their registered address, up to 08 Aug 1996. 76000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 19000 shares (25% of shares), namely:
Mckay, Vicky Anne (an individual) located at Gisborne. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 75% of all shares (exactly 57000 shares); it includes
Harris, Stewart John (an individual) - located at Gisborne. Businesscheck's information was updated on 29 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
61 Carnarvon Street, Gisborne, 4010 | Physical & service | 02 Feb 1996 |
61 Carnarvon Street, Gisborne, 4010 | Registered | 08 Aug 1996 |
9b Sievwright Lane, Whataupoko, Gisborne, 4010 | Registered & service | 21 Jul 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stewart John Harris
Gisborne, 4010
Address used since 14 Aug 2015 |
Director | 21 Apr 1994 - current |
Vicky Anne Mckay
Gisborne, 4010
Address used since 14 Aug 2015 |
Director | 26 May 1994 - current |
Robert John Mcguffog
Gisborne,
Address used since 21 Apr 1994 |
Director | 21 Apr 1994 - 21 Dec 2006 |
Merlene Edna Mcguffog
Gisborne,
Address used since 21 Apr 1994 |
Director | 21 Apr 1994 - 16 Apr 2003 |
Vicky Anne Harris
Gisborne,
Address used since 21 Apr 1994 |
Director | 21 Apr 1994 - 26 May 1994 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
104 Roebuck Road, Gisborne | Registered | 02 Feb 1996 - 08 Aug 1996 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mckay, Vicky Anne Individual |
Gisborne |
08 May 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris, Stewart John Individual |
Gisborne |
21 Apr 1994 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mckay, Vicky Anne Individual |
Gisborne |
21 Apr 1994 - 08 May 2006 |
Mcguffog, Robert John Individual |
Gisborne |
21 Apr 1994 - 08 May 2006 |
Mcguffog, Merlene Edna Individual |
Gisborne |
21 Apr 1994 - 08 May 2006 |
Dl Investments Plus Limited 67 Carnarvon Street |
|
The Toolshed Gisborne (2017) Limited 384 Palmerston Road |
|
O'hara Joinery Limited 390 Palmerston Road |
|
Character Building Limited 394c Palmerston Road |
|
Beluga Ip Holding Company Limited 337 Palmerston Road |
|
Zero H2o Limited 337 Palmerston Road |