Sports Essentials Limited (issued a business number of 9429038899331) was started on 05 Apr 1993. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 40 Oroua Street, Eastbourne (type: registered, physical). 335A Waterloo Road, Lower Hutt had been their registered address, up to 24 Sep 1999. Sports Essentials Limited used more names, namely: Sports Essentials Limited from 05 Apr 1993 to 01 Nov 1999. 1000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.1% of shares), namely:
Holloway, Margaret Eunice (an individual) located at Eastbourne, Lower Hutt postcode 5013. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 99.9% of all shares (999 shares); it includes
Holloway, George Douglas James Grant As Trustee (an individual) - located at Eeastbourne, Wellington 5013,
Holloway, Margaret Eunice (Trustee) (an individual) - located at Eastbourne, Lower Hutt. Our information was last updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
40 Oroua Street, Eastbourne | Registered & physical & service | 24 Sep 1999 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Margaret Eunice Holloway
Eastbourne, Wellington, Wellington, 5013
Address used since 12 Aug 2015 |
Director | 05 Apr 1993 - current |
George Douglas James Grant Holloway
Eastbourne, Wellington, 5013
Address used since 12 Aug 2015 |
Director | 07 Jul 2008 - current |
Jane Christina Holloway
Eastbourne,
Address used since 02 May 1994 |
Director | 02 May 1994 - 04 Aug 1998 |
Geradus Johannes Rys
Totara Park, Upper Hutt,
Address used since 05 Apr 1993 |
Director | 05 Apr 1993 - 17 Nov 1993 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
335a Waterloo Road, Lower Hutt | Registered & physical | 24 Sep 1999 - 24 Sep 1999 |
Kpmg, Level 6, Peat Marwick House, 135, Victoria Str, Wellington | Registered | 16 May 1997 - 24 Sep 1999 |
42 Cheviot Road, Lowry Bay, Eastbourne, Wellington | Registered | 07 Jun 1996 - 16 May 1997 |
225 Muritai Road, Eastbourne, Wellington | Registered | 01 Mar 1995 - 07 Jun 1996 |
225 Muritai Road, Eastbourne, Upper Hutt, Wellington | Registered | 23 Nov 1993 - 01 Mar 1995 |
23 Baltimore Crescent, Totara Park, Upper Hutt | Registered | 22 Nov 1993 - 23 Nov 1993 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holloway, Margaret Eunice Individual |
Eastbourne Lower Hutt 5013 |
05 Apr 1993 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holloway, George Douglas James Grant As Trustee Individual |
Eeastbourne Wellington 5013 |
22 Jul 2009 - current |
Holloway, Margaret Eunice (trustee) Individual |
Eastbourne Lower Hutt 5013 |
05 Apr 1993 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holloway, Geroge Douglas James Grant Individual |
Eastbourne |
05 Apr 1993 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Holloway, George Douglas Jamea Grant As Trustee Individual |
Eastbourne Wellington 5013 |
22 Jul 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Nemidon Limited 40 Oroua Street |
|
Sports Essentials (australia) Limited 40 Oroua Street |
|
Sports Eze Limited 40 Oroua Street |
|
Fitness Systems Eastbourne Limited 1 Rata Street |
|
Hayton And Mccann Trustees Limited 49 Oroua Street |
|
Gellatly Testing Services Limited 10 Rata Street |