Tolerton Properties Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038918162) was registered on 24 Nov 1992. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 28 Egmont Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 (type: physical, registered). Level One, 100 Tory Street, Wellington had been their physical address, up until 04 Sep 2020. 320 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 220 shares (68.75% of shares), namely:
Mclean, Samuel (an individual) located at Hataitai, Wellington postcode 6021,
Wiley, Robert David (an individual) located at Rd 3, Blenheim postcode 7273. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 31.25% of all shares (exactly 100 shares); it includes
Wiley, Robert David (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Blenheim,
Mclean, Samuel (an individual) - located at Hataitai, Wellington. The Businesscheck database was updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
28 Egmont Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered & service | 04 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Andrew Mclean
Rd 3, Blenheim, 7273
Address used since 01 Sep 2015 |
Director | 02 Dec 1998 - current |
Samuel Mclean
Hataitai, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 01 Aug 2016 |
Director | 21 Jul 2008 - current |
Andrew M. | Director | 22 Jul 2008 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Maurice Trevor Turner
Wellington,
Address used since 12 Nov 1997 |
Director | 12 Nov 1997 - 24 Jul 2008 |
Stephen John Brown
Korokoro, Hutt Valley,
Address used since 13 Aug 1993 |
Director | 13 Aug 1993 - 01 Mar 2008 |
Peter Andrew Mclean
Wellington,
Address used since 15 Apr 1996 |
Director | 15 Apr 1996 - 12 Nov 1997 |
Richard Dale Peterson
Khandallah, Wellington,
Address used since 24 Nov 1992 |
Director | 24 Nov 1992 - 15 Aug 1997 |
Murray George Harden
Kilbirnie, Wellington,
Address used since 13 Aug 1993 |
Director | 13 Aug 1993 - 15 Apr 1996 |
Carl John Hansen
Karori, Wellington,
Address used since 24 Nov 1992 |
Director | 24 Nov 1992 - 13 Aug 1993 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level One, 100 Tory Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 29 Aug 2008 - 04 Sep 2020 |
100 Tory Street Level One, Wellington | Registered | 29 Aug 2008 - 04 Sep 2020 |
C M T Turner, Third Floor, 64 Dixon Street, Wellington | Registered | 06 Sep 1997 - 29 Aug 2008 |
C M T Turner, Third Floor, 64 Dixon Street, Wellington | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 01 Jul 1997 |
C/- M T Turner, Third Floor, 64 Dixon Street, Wellington | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 29 Aug 2008 |
C/ Morrison Morpeth, Marac House, 105-109 The Terrace, Wellington | Registered | 30 Apr 1996 - 30 Apr 1996 |
64 Dixon Street, Wellington | Registered | 30 Apr 1996 - 30 Apr 1996 |
C/- M T Turner, Third Floor, 64 Dixon Street, Wellington | Registered | 30 Apr 1996 - 06 Sep 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mclean, Samuel Individual |
Hataitai Wellington 6021 |
24 Jul 2009 - current |
Wiley, Robert David Individual |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 |
03 Apr 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wiley, Robert David Individual |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 |
24 Nov 1992 - current |
Mclean, Samuel Individual |
Hataitai Wellington 6021 |
24 Jul 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mclean, Peter Andrew Individual |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 |
24 Nov 1992 - 09 Aug 2007 |
The Official Assignee In Bankruptcy Of The Property Of Peter Andrew Mclean Other |
08 Jul 2009 - 03 Apr 2012 | |
Mclean, Peter Andrew Individual |
Wellington |
24 Nov 1992 - 09 Aug 2007 |
Turner, Maurice Individual |
Wellington |
24 Nov 1992 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Mclean, Peter Andrew Individual |
Wellington |
24 Nov 1992 - 09 Aug 2007 |
Null - The Official Assignee In Bankruptcy Of The Property Of Peter Andrew Mclean Other |
08 Jul 2009 - 03 Apr 2012 |
Pooja Foods Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
M G Bale Trustees (hill 16) Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Sounds Lifestyle Investments Limited Level 7, 234 Wakefield Street |
|
Customs Agents Wellington Limited Level 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |
|
Ppem Nominees Limited Level 14, 1-3 Willeston Street |
|
Glading Family Trustees Limited Level 10, Greenock House, 39 The Terrace |