Isbister Farms Limited (NZBN 9429039045591) was registered on 11 Dec 1991. 7 addresess are in use by the company: 3A / 335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 (type: registered, service). 27 Albany Street, North Dunedin, Dunedin had been their registered address, up to 09 Oct 2018. 5000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 2500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Strang, Jane Louise (a director) located at Rd 14C, Oamaru postcode 9491. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 2500 shares); it includes
Strang, Lyndon Grant (a director) - located at Rd 14C, Oamaru. The Businesscheck database was updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
27 Albany Street, North Dunedin, Dunedin, 9016 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 30 Aug 2016 |
160 Spey Street, Invercargill, Invercargill, 9810 | Service & physical | 07 Sep 2016 |
160 Spey Street, Invercargill, Invercargill, 9810 | Registered | 09 Oct 2018 |
335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & service | 25 Jul 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lyndon Grant Strang
Rd 14c, Oamaru, 9491
Address used since 29 Sep 2017
Rd 14c, Oamaru, 9491
Address used since 13 Sep 2013 |
Director | 30 Jul 2010 - current |
Jane Louise Strang
Rd 14c, Oamaru, 9491
Address used since 13 Sep 2013
Rd 14c, Oamaru, 9491
Address used since 29 Sep 2017 |
Director | 30 Jul 2010 - current |
Lynette Anne Isbister
Five Forks 9491,
Address used since 18 Sep 2009 |
Director | 11 Dec 1991 - 30 Jul 2010 |
David Murray Isbister
Five Forks 9491,
Address used since 18 Sep 2009 |
Director | 11 Dec 1991 - 30 Jul 2010 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & service | 25 Jul 2023 |
3a / 335 Lincoln Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & service | 15 Aug 2024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
27 Albany Street, North Dunedin, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered | 07 Sep 2016 - 09 Oct 2018 |
27 Albany Street, Dunedin, 9059 | Physical & registered | 17 May 2012 - 07 Sep 2016 |
Whk, 1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, 9400 | Registered & physical | 20 Sep 2011 - 17 May 2012 |
Whk, 6-10 Coquet Street, Oamaru, 9400 | Physical & registered | 24 Sep 2010 - 20 Sep 2011 |
Scott & Co Limited, Chartered Accountants, 10 Coquet Street, Oamaru | Registered | 13 Sep 2007 - 24 Sep 2010 |
Scott & Co Limited, 10 Coquet Street, Oamaru | Physical | 13 Sep 2007 - 24 Sep 2010 |
- | Physical | 15 Oct 1997 - 15 Oct 1997 |
Scott & Co, 27a Coquet Street, Oamaru | Physical | 15 Oct 1997 - 13 Sep 2007 |
C/- Scott & Co, 27a Coquet Street, Oamaru | Registered | 01 Jul 1997 - 13 Sep 2007 |
Gibson Road Peebles, 2 K R D, Oamaru | Registered | 06 Nov 1992 - 01 Jul 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Strang, Jane Louise Director |
Rd 14c Oamaru 9491 |
09 May 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Strang, Lyndon Grant Director |
Rd 14c Oamaru 9491 |
09 May 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Berry, Suzanne Carol Individual |
Oamaru |
11 Dec 1991 - 28 Sep 2004 |
Isbister, Lynette Anne Individual |
Five Forks |
11 Dec 1991 - 30 Jul 2010 |
Dorward, Colleen Harriet Individual |
Oamaru |
11 Dec 1991 - 28 Sep 2004 |
Mason, Patricia Helene Individual |
Oamaru |
11 Dec 1991 - 28 Sep 2004 |
Blunden, Jennifer Kay Individual |
Maheno |
11 Dec 1991 - 28 Sep 2004 |
Aspros, Rowan Jill Individual |
Oamaru |
11 Dec 1991 - 28 Sep 2004 |
Dean, Neisha Irene Individual |
Oamaru |
11 Dec 1991 - 28 Sep 2004 |
Stony Creek Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034096017 Company Number: 1820955 Entity |
30 Jul 2010 - 09 May 2012 | |
Ward, Wendy Faye Individual |
Oamaru |
11 Dec 1991 - 28 Sep 2004 |
De Buyzer, Michael John Individual |
Oamaru |
11 Dec 1991 - 28 Sep 2004 |
Isbister, David Murray Individual |
Five Forks |
11 Dec 1991 - 30 Jul 2010 |
Stony Creek Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034096017 Company Number: 1820955 Entity |
30 Jul 2010 - 09 May 2012 |
Drumderg Farm Limited 27-29 Albany Street |
|
Islesburgh Farm Limited Level 1 |
|
The Australasian Patient Information Charitable Trust C/o Rodgers Nicolson Weatherall |
|
Klone Hair Limited 366 Great King Street |
|
The Otago Branch Of The New Zealand Dental Association Incorporated Knox Dental Lumino The Dentist |
|
Rakiura Retreat Limited Flat 1 |