Dalton Electrical Company Limited (NZBN 9429039100825) was launched on 20 May 1991. 7 addresess are in use by the company: Unit 26, 24 Railway Avenue, Upper Hutt, Wellington, 5018 (type: other, records). 8 Penrose Road, Penrose, Auckland had been their registered address, until 22 Dec 2017. 51000 shares are allocated to 15 shareholders who belong to 11 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 2040 shares (4 per cent of shares), namely:
Schimanski, Fiona Louise (an individual) located at Cockle Bay, Auckland postcode 2014. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 8.7 per cent of all shares (exactly 4437 shares); it includes
Edmondson, Claire Jane (an individual) - located at Shamrock Park, Auckland,
Northland Trustee (2016) Limited (an entity) - located at Whangarei,
Edmondson, Carl David (an individual) - located at Shamrock Park, Auckland. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (2907 shares, 5.7%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
New Zealand Trustee Services Limited, located at 191 Queen Street, Auckland (an entity),
Berry, Mechelle Angela, located at The Gardens, Auckland (an individual),
Berry, Daniel Mark, located at The Gardens, Auckland (an individual). "Electrical engineering service - consulting" (ANZSIC M692335) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Dalton Electrical Company Limited. Our database was updated on 30 Mar 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6 Prescott Street, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 | Registered & physical & service | 22 Dec 2017 |
6 Prescott Street, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 | Postal & office & delivery | 05 Mar 2020 |
Unit 26, 24 Railway Avenue, Upper Hutt, Wellington, 5018 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 05 Apr 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce Jeffrey Dalton
Farm Cove, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 27 Jun 2013 |
Director | 20 Mar 1998 - current |
Bruce Jeffery Dalton
Farm Cove, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 27 Jun 2013 |
Director | 20 Mar 1998 - current |
Daniel Mark Berry
The Gardens, Auckland, 2105
Address used since 20 Jul 2022 |
Director | 20 Jul 2022 - current |
Mary Joan Dalton
Pakuranga, Auckland,
Address used since 20 May 1991 |
Director | 20 May 1991 - 26 Jun 2009 |
David Gerald Dalton
Pakuranga, Auckland,
Address used since 20 May 1991 |
Director | 20 May 1991 - 26 Jun 2009 |
6 Prescott Street , Penrose , Auckland , 1061 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
8 Penrose Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 | Registered & physical | 21 Dec 2017 - 22 Dec 2017 |
64 Portage Road, Otahuhu, Auckland, 1062 | Registered & physical | 17 Mar 2010 - 21 Dec 2017 |
C/- Milne Mangay, 22 Station Road, Otahuhu, Auckland | Physical | 06 Sep 1999 - 06 Sep 1999 |
Milne Mangay, 22 Station Road, Otahuhu | Registered | 06 Sep 1999 - 17 Mar 2010 |
Milne Maingay, 2nd Floor,15b Vestey Drive, Mt Wellington | Physical | 06 Sep 1999 - 06 Sep 1999 |
Level 1, Parkview Tower, 28 Davies Avenue, Manukau City | Registered | 18 Jun 1997 - 06 Sep 1999 |
178 Kolmar Road, Papatoetoe | Registered | 21 Apr 1996 - 18 Jun 1997 |
1 Tamaki Station Road, Panmure | Registered | 16 Jun 1992 - 21 Apr 1996 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Schimanski, Fiona Louise Individual |
Cockle Bay Auckland 2014 |
09 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Edmondson, Claire Jane Individual |
Shamrock Park Auckland 2016 |
12 Sep 2022 - current |
Northland Trustee (2016) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042482956 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whangarei 0110 |
12 Sep 2022 - current |
Edmondson, Carl David Individual |
Shamrock Park Auckland 2016 |
09 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
New Zealand Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037527280 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
191 Queen Street Auckland 1010 |
11 Dec 2022 - current |
Berry, Mechelle Angela Individual |
The Gardens Auckland 2105 |
11 Dec 2022 - current |
Berry, Daniel Mark Individual |
The Gardens Auckland 2105 |
09 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dalton, Bruce Jeffrey Director |
Farm Cove Auckland 2012 |
18 Dec 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dalton, Bruce Jeffrey Director |
Farm Cove Auckland 2012 |
18 Dec 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jackson, Cole John Individual |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 |
09 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fletcher, Anthony Individual |
Green Bay Auckland 0604 |
09 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcinerney, Shaun Robert Individual |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
09 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burton, Rhys John Individual |
Howick Auckland 2014 |
09 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Watt, Grant William Individual |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1060 |
09 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cann, Rowan John Individual |
Otahuhu Auckland 1062 |
09 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dalton, Karen Joy Individual |
Farm Cove Auckland 2012 |
20 May 1991 - 09 Apr 2019 |
Dalton, David Gerald Individual |
Pakuranga Auckland |
20 May 1991 - 09 Aug 2005 |
Dalton, Mary Joan Individual |
Pakuranga Auckland |
20 May 1991 - 09 Aug 2005 |
Dalton, Karen Joy Individual |
Farm Cove Auckland 2012 |
20 May 1991 - 09 Apr 2019 |
Dalton, Karen Joy Individual |
Farm Cove Auckland 2012 |
20 May 1991 - 09 Apr 2019 |
Dalton, Karen Joy Individual |
Farm Cove Auckland 2012 |
20 May 1991 - 09 Apr 2019 |
Dalton, Mary Joan Individual |
Pakuranga Auckland |
20 May 1991 - 09 Aug 2005 |
Dalton, Bruce Jeffery Individual |
Farm Cove Auckland 2012 |
20 May 1991 - 18 Dec 2022 |
Robinson, Charles Stuart Individual |
Farm Cove Manukau 2012 |
20 May 1991 - 27 Jun 2013 |
Dalton, David Gerald Individual |
Pakuranga Auckland |
20 May 1991 - 09 Aug 2005 |
Dalton, Bruce Jeffery Individual |
Farm Cove Auckland 2012 |
20 May 1991 - 18 Dec 2022 |
Maingay, William Brett Individual |
Pakuranga Auckland |
20 May 1991 - 09 Aug 2005 |
Dalton, Bruce Jeffery Individual |
Farm Cove Auckland 2012 |
20 May 1991 - 18 Dec 2022 |
A&k Food Trading Limited 4 Penrose Road |
|
Only Plus Limited 778 Great South Road |
|
Harbour View Property Holdings Limited 770 Great South Road |
|
Autozam Penrose Limited 770 Great South Road |
|
Dash Distributors Pty Ltd 770 Great South Road |
|
Building Prefabrication Solutions Limited 810 Great South Road |
Vb Design Limited 55a Station Road |
Infrastructure Asset Management Systems Limited 6 Mitchelson Street |
Inspection Solutions Limited 6 Mitchelson Street |
Shweta Enterprises (nz) Limited 8/4 Clemow Drive |
Alexander Professional Solutions Limited 48 Amaru Road |
Keen Design Limited 18 Jordan Avenue |