One Ton Rolls Company Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429039208958) was registered on 02 Jul 1990. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 71 Harris Crescent, Christchurch, Christchurch, 8053 (type: registered, physical). 71A Harris Crescent, Christchurch had been their registered address, up to 13 Sep 2019. 5000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 5000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Cheung, Alden (an individual) located at Christchurch postcode 8053. Our database was updated on 14 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
71 Harris Crescent, Christchurch, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alden Cheung
Papanui, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 09 Apr 2001
Papanui, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 05 Sep 2019 |
Director | 02 Jul 1990 - current |
King Tao Cheung
Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 30 Sep 2003 |
Director | 02 Jul 1990 - 20 Mar 2015 |
71 Harris Crescent , Christchurch , Christchurch , 8053 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
71a Harris Crescent, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 20 Sep 2006 - 13 Sep 2019 |
Level 3, 99 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Physical | 08 Oct 1999 - 08 Oct 1999 |
Clifford Chan & Co, Chartered Accountant, 50 Riccarton Road, Christchuch | Physical | 08 Oct 1999 - 20 Sep 2006 |
99 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Registered | 08 Oct 1999 - 20 Sep 2006 |
Broadbase Consulting Group, 93 Manchester Street, Christchurch | Registered | 01 Mar 1993 - 08 Oct 1999 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cheung, Alden Individual |
Christchurch 8053 |
02 Jul 1990 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cheung, King Tao Individual |
Christchurch 8 |
02 Jul 1990 - 08 Sep 2015 |
Mpn Limited 180a Condell Avenue |
|
Aged Advisor (nz) Limited 174 Condell Avenue |
|
Congfond Brothers Limited 84 Harris Crescent |
|
Open Future Limited 164 Condell Avenue |
|
Marist Albion Netball Club Incorporated 181 Condell Avenue |
|
Design Agencies Limited 35 Bourne Crescent |