Kkis Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429039262646) was started on 27 Nov 1989. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 214 Main Road, Tawa, Wellington, 5028 (type: registered, physical). 61 Amesbury Drive, Churton Park, Wellington had been their physical address, until 12 Apr 2016. Kkis Holdings Limited used more names, namely: Island Bay Video (1989) Limited from 27 Nov 1989 to 21 Sep 1995. 30000 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 300 shares (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Madhav, Surash Dullabh (an individual) located at Churton Park, Wellington. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 98 per cent of all shares (29400 shares); it includes
Hanning, John David (an individual) - located at Oriental Bay, Wellington,
Madhav, Ila Surash (an individual) - located at Churton Park, Wellington,
Madhav, Surash Dullabh (an individual) - located at Churton Park, Wellington. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (300 shares, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Madhav, Ila Surash, located at Churton Park, Wellington (an individual). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
214 Main Road, Tawa, Wellington, 5028 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Apr 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Surash Dullabh Madhav
Churton Park, Wellington, 6037
Address used since 27 Nov 1989 |
Director | 27 Nov 1989 - current |
Ila Surash Madhav
Churton Park, Wellington, 6037
Address used since 27 Nov 1989 |
Director | 27 Nov 1989 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
61 Amesbury Drive, Churton Park, Wellington, 6037 | Physical & registered | 09 Oct 2007 - 12 Apr 2016 |
Kpmg, Level 9, 2-10 Customhouse Quay, Wellington 6011 | Registered & physical | 10 Nov 2006 - 09 Oct 2007 |
6a Gipps Street, Karori, Wellington | Physical | 08 Mar 2001 - 08 Mar 2001 |
6a Gipps Street, Karori, Wellington | Registered | 08 Mar 2001 - 10 Nov 2006 |
Level 7, Kpmg Centre, 135 Victoria Street, Wellington | Physical | 08 Mar 2001 - 10 Nov 2006 |
Construction House,, Level 3,, 80-82 Kent Terrace,, Wellington | Registered | 22 Nov 1995 - 08 Mar 2001 |
- | Physical | 13 Nov 1995 - 08 Mar 2001 |
C/ Peat Marwick, Peat Marwick House, 135 Victoria Street, Wellington | Registered | 18 Nov 1993 - 22 Nov 1995 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Madhav, Surash Dullabh Individual |
Churton Park Wellington |
10 Oct 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hanning, John David Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
10 Oct 2005 - current |
Madhav, Ila Surash Individual |
Churton Park Wellington |
14 Oct 2003 - current |
Madhav, Surash Dullabh Individual |
Churton Park Wellington |
10 Oct 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Madhav, Ila Surash Individual |
Churton Park Wellington |
27 Nov 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hanning, John David Individual |
Karori Wellington |
14 Oct 2003 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Sri Sai Hair & Beauty Limited 214 Main Road |
|
Csr Cleaning Services Limited 214 Main Road |
|
Tfs Corporate Trustees Limited 214 Main Road |
|
Tinakori Flooring Commercial Limited 214 Main Road |
|
S S Khan Asset Management Limited 214 Main Road |
|
Tinakori Flooring Asset Management Limited 214 Main Road |