Dornwell Properties Services Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429039321053) was launched on 01 Jun 1989. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: 1456A Dominion Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 (type: registered, physical). 49A Mount Roskill Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland had been their registered address, until 19 Aug 2019. Dornwell Properties Services Limited used more aliases, namely: Dornwell Technology Limited from 14 Oct 1997 to 27 Nov 2007, Sunny Lin Limited (01 Jun 1989 to 14 Oct 1997). 10000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 3000 shares (30% of shares), namely:
Chen, Marian (an individual) located at Mount Roskill, Auckland postcode 1041. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 70% of all shares (exactly 7000 shares); it includes
Lin, Tien-Tsung (an individual) - located at Mount Roskill, Auckland. "Electronic goods retailing nec" (ANZSIC G422930) is the category the ABS issued to Dornwell Properties Services Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
49b Mount Roskill Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Other (Address for Records) | 11 Nov 2015 |
1456a Dominion Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Postal & office & delivery | 09 Aug 2019 |
1456a Dominion Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Aug 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Tien-tsung Lin
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 12 Aug 2020
Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 11 Nov 2015
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 01 Aug 2017 |
Director | 14 Aug 1990 - current |
Marian Chen
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 12 Aug 2020
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 01 Jul 2018 |
Director | 01 Jul 2018 - current |
Shih Pi-wu Lin
Mt Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 31 Aug 2007 |
Director | 14 Aug 1990 - 25 May 2011 |
1456a Dominion Road , Mount Roskill , Auckland , 1041 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
49a Mount Roskill Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Registered & physical | 30 Aug 2017 - 19 Aug 2019 |
49b Mount Roskill Road, Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041 | Physical & registered | 19 Nov 2015 - 30 Aug 2017 |
Level 1, Federal Court, 198 Federal Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 01 Mar 2007 - 19 Nov 2015 |
Level 15 Affco House, 12-26 Swanson St, Auckland | Physical | 05 Sep 2003 - 01 Mar 2007 |
Level 15, Affco House, 12-26 Swanson St, Auckland | Registered | 11 Aug 2003 - 01 Mar 2007 |
18th Floor, Price Waterhouse Centre, 66 Wyndham Street, Auckland | Physical | 07 Nov 1997 - 07 Nov 1997 |
Level 12, 242 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 07 Nov 1997 - 05 Sep 2003 |
18th Floor, Price Waterhouse Centre, 66 Wyndham Street, Auckland | Registered | 07 Nov 1997 - 11 Aug 2003 |
18th Floor, Quay Tower, 29 Customs Street West, Auckland | Registered | 22 Sep 1993 - 07 Nov 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chen, Marian Individual |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 |
03 Aug 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lin, Tien-tsung Individual |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 |
01 Jun 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lin, Sheree Pi-wu Individual |
Mt Roskill Auckland |
01 Jun 1989 - 11 Aug 2011 |
Masters Trust 51 Carr Road |
|
Samoan Unity Christian Church Trust 51a Carr Road |
|
Family Builders International 47 Mount Roskill Road |
|
Kobs Property Holdings Limited 48 Mount Roskill Road |
|
Symonds Street Dental Centre Limited Level 4, 52 Symonds Street |
|
Village Style Food Limited Level 1, 666 Dominion Road |
Tpex Limited 34c Maioro Street |
Bits4bots Limited 16 Maioro Street |
Gadgets Online NZ Limited 602 Dominion Road |
Blackvue (new Zealand) Limited 9 Trinidad Street |
Jhy Holding Limited 697 Mount Eden Road |
Vihdia Limited 1237 New North Road |