Head Trust Company Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429039420923) was launched on 31 Oct 1988. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 15 The Todd Building, 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, physical). Level 14 The Todd Building, 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington had been their physical address, until 04 Jul 2012. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 25 shares (25% of shares), namely:
Hutchison, Thomas Douglas (a director) located at Rd 3, Blenheim postcode 7273,
Riddiford, Jessica Jane (a director) located at Mount Eden, Auckland postcode 1024,
Todd, David Malfroy (a director) located at Saint Marys Bay, Auckland postcode 1011. Businesscheck's information was updated on 10 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 15 The Todd Building, 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Jul 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomas Douglas Hutchison
Rd 3, Blenheim, 7273
Address used since 03 Nov 2020 |
Director | 03 Nov 2020 - current |
David Malfroy Todd
Saint Marys Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 03 Nov 2020 |
Director | 03 Nov 2020 - current |
Jessica Jane Riddiford
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 03 Nov 2020 |
Director | 03 Nov 2020 - current |
James Roger Heathfield Turner
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 10 Mar 2023 |
Director | 10 Mar 2023 - current |
Thomas Gerald Parsonson
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 13 Oct 2023 |
Director | 13 Oct 2023 - current |
Margot Anna Sellar
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 26 Oct 2023 |
Director | 26 Oct 2023 - current |
James John Robert Whyte
Thorndon, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 03 Nov 2020 |
Director | 03 Nov 2020 - 29 Aug 2023 |
Michael John Todd
Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 09 Sep 2020
Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 20 Oct 2016 |
Director | 31 Oct 1988 - 17 Aug 2023 |
Henry Alexander Bryan Tait
Kelburn, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 20 Sep 2016 |
Director | 31 Oct 1988 - 17 Aug 2023 |
Malcolm Arthur Charles Whyte
Kelburn, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 01 Sep 2009 |
Director | 01 Sep 1992 - 08 Jun 2023 |
Michael Raymund Burtscher
Ilam, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 03 Nov 2020 |
Director | 03 Nov 2020 - 26 Oct 2022 |
Andrew James Reid
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 11 Sep 2015 |
Director | 11 Sep 2015 - 03 Nov 2020 |
David Noel John Todd
Roseneath, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 31 Oct 1988 |
Director | 31 Oct 1988 - 11 Sep 2015 |
John Desmond Todd
254 Oriental Parade, Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 01 Sep 2009 |
Director | 31 Oct 1988 - 29 Jul 2015 |
David Malfroy Todd
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 31 Oct 1988 |
Director | 31 Oct 1988 - 15 Dec 1999 |
Patrick Robet Whyte
No 3 Road Rd3, Te Puke,
Address used since 01 Sep 1992 |
Director | 01 Sep 1992 - 29 Jan 1999 |
Alan Gordon Tait
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 31 Oct 1988 |
Director | 31 Oct 1988 - 20 Jan 1999 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 14 The Todd Building, 95 Customhouse Quay, Wellington | Physical & registered | 23 Jun 2003 - 04 Jul 2012 |
C/o Todd Group Investments, Level 11 The, Todd Bldg, Corner Lambton Quay &, Brandon Streets, Wellington | Registered | 22 Dec 2000 - 23 Jun 2003 |
The Todd Building, 12th Floor Cnr Lambton Quay & Brandon St, Wellington | Physical | 20 May 1997 - 23 Jun 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hutchison, Thomas Douglas Director |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 |
17 Oct 2023 - current |
Riddiford, Jessica Jane Director |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
17 Oct 2023 - current |
Todd, David Malfroy Director |
Saint Marys Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Whyte, Malcolm Arthur Charles Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Todd, David Noel John Individual |
Roseneath Wellington 6011 |
31 Oct 1988 - 07 Dec 2015 |
Whyte, Malcolm Arthur Charles Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Tait, Henry Alexander Bryan Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Tait, Henry Alexander Bryan Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Tait, Henry Alexander Bryan Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Tait, Henry Alexander Bryan Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Todd, Michael John Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Todd, Michael John Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Todd, Michael John Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Todd, Michael John Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Todd, Michael John Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Todd, Michael John Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Todd, Michael John Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Whyte, Malcolm Arthur Charles Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Whyte, Malcolm Arthur Charles Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Whyte, Malcolm Arthur Charles Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Whyte, Malcolm Arthur Charles Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Whyte, Malcolm Arthur Charles Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Tait, Henry Alexander Bryan Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Tait, Henry Alexander Bryan Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Tait, Henry Alexander Bryan Individual |
Kelburn Wellington 6012 |
31 Oct 1988 - 17 Oct 2023 |
Reid, Andrew James Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
07 Dec 2015 - 12 Nov 2020 |
Reid, Andrew James Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
07 Dec 2015 - 12 Nov 2020 |
Reid, Andrew James Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
07 Dec 2015 - 12 Nov 2020 |
Reid, Andrew James Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
07 Dec 2015 - 12 Nov 2020 |
Todd, John Desmond Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
31 Oct 1988 - 14 Sep 2015 |
Todd Sisson (nz) Limited The Todd Building |
|
Marokopa Drilling Limited The Todd Building |
|
Tsl Methanol Limited The Todd Building |
|
Todd Energy International Limited Level 15, The Todd Building |
|
Nova Energy Limited Level 15, The Todd Building |
|
Tio (nz) Limited The Todd Building |