Parnell Gallery Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429039422460) was launched on 22 Dec 1988. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 263 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: office, delivery). Parnell Gallery Limited used other aliases, namely: The Hang Up Gallery Limited from 22 Dec 1988 to 15 Aug 2016. 1000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.1% of shares), namely:
Souness, Elizabeth V (an individual) located at Parnell, Auckland. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 49.9% of all shares (exactly 499 shares); it includes
Springhall, George Stephen John (an individual) - located at Orakei, Auckland,
Souness, Elizabeth V (an individual) - located at Parnell, Auckland. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (500 shares, 50%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Silcock, Anna Elizabeth, located at Avondale, Auckland (an individual). "Art gallery operation - retail" (ANZSIC G427913) is the classification the ABS issued to Parnell Gallery Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
263 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland | Physical & registered & service | 01 Jul 1997 |
263 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Office & delivery | 05 Oct 2019 |
P O Box 37075, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Postal | 05 Oct 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Elizabeth V Souness
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 09 Sep 2015 |
Director | 05 Dec 1989 - current |
Anna Elizabeth Silcock
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 25 Nov 2020
Avondale, Auckland, 1026
Address used since 31 Jul 2016 |
Director | 31 Jul 2016 - current |
263 Parnell Road , Parnell , Auckland , 1052 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Souness, Elizabeth V Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
22 Dec 1988 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Springhall, George Stephen John Individual |
Orakei Auckland 1071 |
06 Oct 2017 - current |
Souness, Elizabeth V Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
22 Dec 1988 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Silcock, Anna Elizabeth Individual |
Avondale Auckland 1026 |
12 Oct 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcdell, Terrence Individual |
Meadowbank |
22 Dec 1988 - 12 Oct 2016 |
Cunningham, Janalyn F Individual |
Milford Auckland |
22 Dec 1988 - 06 Oct 2017 |
Contemporary Art Of New Zealand Limited 251 Parnell Road |
|
Xinjiufu Limited 5/279 Parnell Road |
|
2050 Alliance Aotearoa New Zealand 258/3 Parnell Road |
|
Te Reo Rangatira Trust 283 Parnell Road |
|
Essential Osteopathy Limited 252 Parnell Road |
|
Blue Elephant Thai Restaurant Limited 237 Parnell Road |
Contemporary Art Of New Zealand Limited 251 Parnell Road |
Slg Steelworks Limited Level 4, 3 Ferncroft Street |
Art @ Lorne Limited 10-14 Lorne Street |
Pacific Echoes Limited 247 Symonds Street |
F M & Associates Limited 510 Karangahape Road |
Tim Melville Gallery Limited 50 Haslett Street |