House Of Travel West Coast Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429039504371) was registered on 23 Dec 1987. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Suite 3, Level 1, 478 Cranford Street, Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 (type: registered, service). C/- House Of Travel Holdings Limited, 100A Orchard Road, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 06 Aug 2015. House Of Travel West Coast Limited used more names, namely: Mark Davidson House Of Travel Limited from 13 May 1993 to 03 Jun 2008, House Of Travel Westland Limited (23 Dec 1987 to 13 May 1993). 110000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 27500 shares (25 per cent of shares), namely:
House Of Travel Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Redwood, Christchurch postcode 8051. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 55000 shares); it includes
House Of Travel Holdings Limited (an entity) - located at Redwood, Christchurch. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allocation (27500 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Graham, Stacey Margaret Bruce, located at Ahaura (an individual). The Businesscheck data was updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2/175 Roydvale Avenue, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical & registered & service | 06 Aug 2015 |
Suite 3, Level 1, 478 Cranford Street, Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 | Registered | 02 Apr 2024 |
141 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Service | 02 Apr 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stacey Margaret Bruce Graham
Totara Flat, 7871
Address used since 26 Jul 2022
Ahaura, 7871
Address used since 30 May 2020
Camerons, Greymouth, 7805
Address used since 24 Jul 2017
Rd 1, Dobson, Moana, 7872
Address used since 10 Jul 2018
Ahaura, 7871
Address used since 08 Jun 2019 |
Director | 21 Apr 2008 - current |
Jayne Lesley Thornley
Stanley Point, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 29 Mar 2018 |
Director | 29 Mar 2018 - current |
Jayne Lesley Alldred
Beach Haven, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 05 Jan 2020
Stanley Point, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 29 Mar 2018 |
Director | 29 Mar 2018 - current |
Anne Mary Campbell
Greymouth, 7805
Address used since 29 Jul 2015 |
Director | 21 Apr 2008 - 14 May 2024 |
Harriet Lucy Woods
Cracroft, Christchurch, 8025
Address used since 01 Apr 2023 |
Director | 01 Apr 2023 - 16 Jan 2024 |
Christopher William Paulsen
Britannia Heights, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 01 Oct 2018
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 23 May 2014 |
Director | 25 Nov 1992 - 01 Apr 2023 |
Kevin Paul Stevenson
Hokitika, 7810
Address used since 29 Jul 2015 |
Director | 21 Apr 2008 - 01 Jun 2020 |
Julie Anne Bohnenn
Rd 1, Rangiora (alternate Director), 7471
Address used since 29 Jul 2010 |
Director | 05 Jan 1999 - 29 Mar 2018 |
Mark Davidson
Westport,
Address used since 20 Jul 2007 |
Director | 17 Feb 1993 - 21 Apr 2008 |
Michelle Jane Davidson
Westport,
Address used since 20 Jul 2007 |
Director | 15 Jul 1996 - 21 Apr 2008 |
Helen Rosemary Barnes
Westmere, Auckland,
Address used since 25 Nov 1992 |
Director | 25 Nov 1992 - 01 Jun 1998 |
Jocelyn Margaret Walls
Christchurch,
Address used since 10 Aug 1992 |
Director | 10 Aug 1992 - 15 Jul 1996 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/- House Of Travel Holdings Limited, 100a Orchard Road, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered & physical | 04 Aug 2011 - 06 Aug 2015 |
House Of Travel Holdings Limited, Level 1 / Allan Mclean Building, 210 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 01 Jun 2004 - 04 Aug 2011 |
236 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Registered | 11 Jul 1997 - 01 Jun 2004 |
Westland Bank, 99 Revell Street, Hokitika | Registered | 13 Jul 1993 - 11 Jul 1997 |
- | Physical | 20 Feb 1992 - 20 Feb 1992 |
House Of Travel Holdings Limited, Level 3 / 210 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch | Physical | 20 Feb 1992 - 01 Jun 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
House Of Travel Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039634689 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Redwood Christchurch 8051 |
23 Dec 1987 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
House Of Travel Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039634689 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Redwood Christchurch 8051 |
23 Dec 1987 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Graham, Stacey Margaret Bruce Individual |
Ahaura 7871 |
07 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Campbell, Anne Mary Individual |
Greymouth |
07 May 2008 - 02 Aug 2024 |
Campbell, Anne Mary Individual |
Greymouth |
08 Sep 2005 - 27 Jul 2007 |
Davidson, Mark Individual |
Westport |
23 Dec 1987 - 01 May 2008 |
Stevenson, Kevin Paul Individual |
Hokitika |
07 May 2008 - 23 Jun 2020 |
House Of Travel Lynnmall Limited 2/175 Roydvale Avenue |
|
Kate Smyth House Of Travel Limited 2/175 Roydvale Avenue |
|
Inde Technology Limited 175 Roydvale Avenue |
|
The Tait Foundation 175 Roydvale Avenue |
|
Powerlab Limited 5 Sheffield Crescent |
|
Izon Science Limited Unit C - 8 Homersham Place |