Cronin Group Limited (NZBN 9429039568489) was started on 10 Nov 1987. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 158 Broadway, Marton, Marton, 4710 (type: office, physical). 16 High Street, Marton 4710 had been their registered address, until 03 Aug 2012. Cronin Group Limited used more names, namely: Cronin Wells Engineering Limited from 10 Nov 1987 to 13 Oct 2021. 30000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 10000 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
Cronin, Patrick James (an individual) located at Marton, Marton postcode 4710. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33% of all shares (10000 shares); it includes
Cronin, Pauline Linda (an individual) - located at Marton, Marton. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allocation (10000 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Cronin, Colin James, located at Marton, Marton (an individual). "Crane hiring or leasing - with operator" (business classification E329210) is the category the ABS issued to Cronin Group Limited. Our database was last updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
158 Broadway, Marton, Marton, 4710 | Office | unknown |
158 Broadway, Marton, 4710 | Physical & service | 03 Aug 2012 |
91 Tutaenui Road, Marton, 4710 | Registered | 03 Aug 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Colin James Cronin
Marton, Marton, 4710
Address used since 22 Nov 2021
Marton, 4710
Address used since 26 Jul 2012 |
Director | 04 Nov 1991 - current |
Pauline Linda Cronin
Marton, Marton, 4710
Address used since 22 Nov 2021
Marton, 4710
Address used since 26 Jul 2012 |
Director | 01 Jan 2009 - current |
Patrick James Cronin
Marton, Marton, 4710
Address used since 26 Nov 2021 |
Director | 26 Nov 2021 - current |
Bruce Leonard Wells
Marton, 4710
Address used since 25 Nov 2008 |
Director | 04 Nov 1991 - 01 Jan 2009 |
158 Broadway , Marton , Marton , 4710 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
16 High Street, Marton 4710 | Registered | 02 Dec 2008 - 03 Aug 2012 |
16 High Street, Marton | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 03 Aug 2012 |
16 High Street, Marton | Registered | 01 Jul 1997 - 02 Dec 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cronin, Patrick James Individual |
Marton Marton 4710 |
03 Oct 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cronin, Pauline Linda Individual |
Marton Marton 4710 |
10 Nov 1987 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cronin, Colin James Individual |
Marton Marton 4710 |
10 Nov 1987 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wells, Suzanne Patricia Individual |
Marton 4710 |
10 Nov 1987 - 25 Nov 2008 |
Wells, Bruce Leonard Individual |
Marton 4710 |
10 Nov 1987 - 25 Nov 2008 |
Epic Education Trust Centennial Mall |
|
Marton And Districts Budget Service Incorporated 188 Broadway |
|
Renewal Ministries St Andrews Presbyterian Church |
|
Alf. Downs & Son Limited 235 Broadway |
|
Tahu's Ark Limited 28 Hair Street |
|
Knopf Contracting Limited 248 Broadway |
Titan Cranes Limited 15 Port Rd |
Ian Roebuck Crane Hire Limited 105 Corbett Road |
Group Hire Limited 2 Alfred Street |
Access & Lifting Solutions Limited 7 Newman Avenue |
Ashton Crane Hire Limited 58 Uxbridge Road |
Cranetec Plant Hire Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |