Mge (2022) Limited (NZBN 9429039622297) was incorporated on 23 May 1987. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 (type: physical, registered). Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings had been their physical address, up to 29 Aug 2019. Mge (2022) Limited used other names, namely: Hastings Laminate and Stone Limited from 23 Feb 2015 to 01 Feb 2022, Hastings Laminate Limited (23 May 1987 to 23 Feb 2015). 10000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 5000 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Eyles, Mark (an individual) located at Poraiti, Napier postcode 4112. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 5000 shares); it includes
Eyles, Grant (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Napier. Businesscheck's information was updated on 03 May 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered & service | 29 Aug 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Grant Eyles
Rd 3, Napier, 4183
Address used since 29 Apr 2013 |
Director | 30 Sep 2003 - current |
Mark Eyles
Poraiti, Napier, 4112
Address used since 07 Oct 2022
Rd4, Napier, 4184
Address used since 01 Apr 2015 |
Director | 30 Sep 2003 - current |
Nicholas Eyles
Taradale, Napier,
Address used since 17 Aug 1989 |
Director | 17 Aug 1989 - 30 Sep 2003 |
Jennifer Eyles
Taradale, Napier,
Address used since 17 Aug 1989 |
Director | 17 Aug 1989 - 30 Sep 2003 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered | 12 Mar 2018 - 29 Aug 2019 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Physical | 11 Mar 2015 - 12 Mar 2018 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered | 11 Oct 2013 - 12 Mar 2018 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered | 25 Jun 2012 - 11 Oct 2013 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Physical | 25 Jun 2012 - 11 Mar 2015 |
Bdo Hawkes Bay Limited, 86 Station Street, Napier | Physical & registered | 19 Oct 2009 - 25 Jun 2012 |
Bdo Spicers Hawke's Bay Ltd, 86 Station Street, Napier | Physical & registered | 27 Nov 2007 - 19 Oct 2009 |
86 Station Street, Napier | Registered & physical | 18 Jul 2005 - 27 Nov 2007 |
Edwards & Co, Chartered Accoutants, Old Mow Buidling, First Floor, Cnr Shakespeare Rd & Browning St, Napier | Registered | 29 Apr 2003 - 18 Jul 2005 |
Edwards & Co, Chartered Accountants, Old Mow Building, First Floor, Cnr Shakespeare Rd & Browning St, Napier | Physical | 29 Apr 2003 - 18 Jul 2005 |
Edwards & Co, Chartered Accountants, 76 Tennyson Street, Napier | Registered | 02 Oct 1996 - 29 Apr 2003 |
C/- Ernst & Young, Cnr Marine Parade & Vautier Street, Napier | Registered | 20 May 1996 - 02 Oct 1996 |
Edwards & Co, Chartered Accountants, Old, Mow Bldg, Cnr Shakespeare Rd & Browning, St, Napier | Physical | 20 Feb 1992 - 29 Apr 2003 |
- | Physical | 20 Feb 1992 - 20 Feb 1992 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eyles, Mark Individual |
Poraiti Napier 4112 |
21 Apr 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eyles, Grant Individual |
Rd 3 Napier 4183 |
21 Apr 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eyles, Jennifer Individual |
Taradale Napier |
21 Apr 2004 - 21 Apr 2004 |
Eyles, Nicholas Individual |
Taradale Napier |
21 Apr 2004 - 21 Apr 2004 |
Eyles, Jennifer Individual |
Taradale Napier |
21 Apr 2004 - 21 Apr 2004 |
Edwards, G Individual |
Napier |
21 Apr 2004 - 21 Apr 2004 |
Eyles, Nicholas Individual |
Taradale Napier |
21 Apr 2004 - 21 Apr 2004 |
Black Folder Limited Building A, Level 1, Farming House |
|
Poukawa Holdings Limited 211 Market Street |
|
David Brownrigg Investments Limited Farming House |
|
Farming House Limited 211 Market Street South |
|
Kiwiwines2u Limited Building A, Level 1, Farming House |
|
Brownrigg Agriculture Limited 211 Market Street South |