Hick Bros Civil Construction Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429039685001) was started on 02 Oct 1986. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: Po Box 146, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0944 (type: postal, office). Level 13, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland had been their physical address, until 03 Jun 2020. Hick Bros Civil Construction Limited used more aliases, namely: Hick Bros Earthmoving Contractors Limited from 01 Oct 1997 to 17 Oct 2000, Hick Bros Operations Limited (22 Dec 1995 to 01 Oct 1997) and Hick Bros. Earthmoving Contractors Limited (18 Dec 1986 - 22 Dec 1995). 30000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 30000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Hick Bros Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Silverdale, Silverdale postcode 0932. Our information was last updated on 24 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
42 Forge Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Registered & physical & service | 03 Jun 2020 |
Po Box 146, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0944 | Postal | 06 Nov 2020 |
42 Forge Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Office & delivery | 06 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Anthony Cole
Rd 3, Riverhead, 0793
Address used since 06 Nov 2020
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 30 Oct 2013 |
Director | 13 May 2004 - current |
Carol Anne Campbell
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 06 Oct 2008 |
Director | 06 Oct 2008 - current |
Graham Brockway Darlow
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 01 Oct 2017 |
Director | 01 Oct 2017 - current |
Ernst Daniel Hohneck
Rd 2, Helensville, 0875
Address used since 01 Oct 2017 |
Director | 01 Oct 2017 - current |
Robert Bell Fenwick
Rd 3, Coatesville, 0793
Address used since 02 Nov 2022
Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932
Address used since 06 Nov 2020
Rd 1, Silverdale, 0994
Address used since 24 Jan 2017 |
Director | 02 Dec 2010 - 27 Jun 2024 |
Cecil Wayne Hick
Orewa, Orewa, 0931
Address used since 03 Nov 2015 |
Director | 14 Nov 1991 - 01 Oct 2015 |
Cherry Patricia Hick
Orewa, Orewa, 0931
Address used since 03 Nov 2015 |
Director | 06 Oct 2008 - 01 Oct 2015 |
Steven Francis Hick
Matakatia, Whangaparaoa, 0930
Address used since 27 Nov 2009 |
Director | 14 Nov 1991 - 28 Mar 2014 |
Gary Neil Hick
Glenfield, Auckland,
Address used since 25 Oct 1991 |
Director | 25 Oct 1991 - 13 May 2004 |
William Hick
Hadfield Beach,
Address used since 15 Nov 1992 |
Director | 15 Nov 1992 - 18 Mar 1997 |
Robert Clive Hick
Paremoremo,
Address used since 14 Nov 1991 |
Director | 14 Nov 1991 - 05 Aug 1993 |
42 Forge Road , Silverdale , Silverdale , 0932 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 13, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 19 May 2006 - 03 Jun 2020 |
Ernst & Young Limited, Level 14, 41 Shortland Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 14 Nov 2002 - 19 May 2006 |
12 Tavern Road, Silverdale, North Auckland | Physical | 09 Aug 2000 - 09 Aug 2000 |
Same As Registered Office | Physical | 09 Aug 2000 - 14 Nov 2002 |
12 Tavern Road, Silverdale, North Auckland | Registered | 09 Aug 2000 - 14 Nov 2002 |
- | Physical | 19 Feb 1992 - 09 Aug 2000 |
Ground Floor, Hames House,, 1 Turner Street,, Auckland. | Registered | 19 Nov 1991 - 09 Aug 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hick Bros Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031359566 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 |
16 Dec 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Campbell, Carol Anne Individual |
St Heliers Auckland |
02 Oct 1986 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Cole, Mark Anthony Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland |
26 Nov 2004 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Hick, Gary Neil Individual |
Glenfield Auckland |
02 Oct 1986 - 26 Nov 2004 |
Hick, Steven Francis Individual |
Matakatia Hibiscus Coast |
02 Oct 1986 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Hick, Bette-ann Individual |
Glenfield Auckland |
02 Oct 1986 - 26 Nov 2004 |
Cole, Paula Maria Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland |
26 Nov 2004 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Hick, Cherry Patricia Individual |
Orewa |
02 Oct 1986 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Hick, Reti Kathleen Individual |
Matakatia Hibiscus Coast |
02 Oct 1986 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Parkinson, Paul Colin Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland |
09 Mar 2007 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Hick, Cecil Wayne Individual |
Orewa |
02 Oct 1986 - 16 Dec 2010 |
Name | Hick Bros Holdings Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 3152666 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 13, 34 Shortland Street Auckland 1010 |
Eclairs Childcare (henderson) Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
|
Te Tiaki Trust Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
|
Pynenburg Trustees Limited Level 14 |
|
Markgraaff Trustee Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
|
Private Estates NZ Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
|
Eclairs Childcare Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |