Sutherland Services Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429039842831) was registered on 25 Sep 1985. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 13 John Campbell Crescent, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 (type: postal, office). 9 / 14 Harriett Street, Thorndon, Wellington 6001 had been their registered address, up until 19 Apr 2012. Sutherland Services Limited used other aliases, namely: Savage Print Limited from 25 Sep 1985 to 29 Sep 1999. 40000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 20000 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Sutherland, Suzanne Findlay (an individual) located at Middleton, Christchurch postcode 8024. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 20000 shares); it includes
Sutherland, David John (an individual) - located at Middleton, Christchurch. "Business consultant service" (ANZSIC M696205) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Sutherland Services Limited. Our database was updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
13 John Campbell Crescent, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Physical & service & registered | 19 Apr 2012 |
13 John Campbell Crescent, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Postal & office & delivery | 24 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David John Sutherland
Middleton, Christchurch, 8024
Address used since 11 Apr 2012 |
Director | 10 May 1990 - current |
Suzanne Findlay Sutherland
Middleton, Christchurch, 8024
Address used since 11 Apr 2012 |
Director | 10 May 1990 - current |
13 John Campbell Crescent , Middleton , Christchurch , 8024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
9 / 14 Harriett Street, Thorndon, Wellington 6001 | Registered & physical | 14 Mar 2005 - 19 Apr 2012 |
43 Hoon Hay Road, Christchurch | Registered | 29 Apr 2002 - 14 Mar 2005 |
43 Hoon Hay Road, Christchurch | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 14 Mar 2005 |
211 Durham Street, Christchurch | Registered | 28 Apr 1992 - 29 Apr 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sutherland, Suzanne Findlay Individual |
Middleton Christchurch 8024 |
25 Sep 1985 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sutherland, David John Individual |
Middleton Christchurch 8024 |
25 Sep 1985 - current |
Ogeejan Investments Limited 4 John Campbell Crescent |
|
Pacfic Rim Consulting Group Limited 3 Dave Jamieson Lane |
|
The Llama Station Limited 3 Dave Jamieson Lane |
|
Terry Spekreijse & Associates Limited 3 Dave Jamieson Lane |
|
Commercial Structures Limited 7 Pavilion Crescent |
|
Discovery Travel Limited 8 The Wickets |
Trueman Tier Limited 10 Seager Lane |
Fitzgerald Tier Limited 10 Seager Lane |
Think Group Limited 34 Mokihi Gardens |
Cw Works Limited 9 Hinemoa Street |
Montgomery & Co Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |
Innovation Matters Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |