Katikati Honey & Bee Centre Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429039914217) was started on 10 Sep 1984. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 2918 State Highway 2, Rd 2, Tahawai, 3178 (type: postal, office). 13-4 Talisman Drive, Katikati had been their physical address, up to 16 May 2019. 1000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Brown, John Laurence (an individual) located at R D 2, Katikati postcode 3178. "Apiarist" (business classification A019310) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Katikati Honey & Bee Centre Limited. Our information was last updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
13 - B 4 Talisman Drive, Katikati, 3129 | Physical & service & registered | 16 May 2019 |
2918 State Highway 2, Rd 2, Tahawai, 3178 | Postal & office & delivery | 05 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Laurence Brown
Rd 2, Katikati, 3178
Address used since 01 Jan 2014
R D 2, Katikati, 3178
Address used since 08 May 2019 |
Director | 10 Sep 1984 - current |
Suzanne Kay Brown
R D 2, Katikati,
Address used since 10 Sep 1984 |
Director | 10 Sep 1984 - 31 Mar 2004 |
2918 State Highway 2 , Rd 2 , Tahawai , 3178 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
13-4 Talisman Drive, Katikati, 3129 | Physical & registered | 28 May 2013 - 16 May 2019 |
C/o Accumulus Ltd, 13 Talisman Drive, Katikati, 3129 | Physical & registered | 29 Jun 2010 - 28 May 2013 |
13 Talisman Drive, Katikati, 3129 | Physical & registered | 15 May 2008 - 29 Jun 2010 |
Accumulus Limited, 21 Main Road, Katikati | Registered & physical | 04 Apr 2007 - 15 May 2008 |
Dunning Okey, 21 Main Road, Katikati | Registered & physical | 28 May 2004 - 04 Apr 2007 |
Main Road, R D 2, Katikati | Physical & registered | 01 Jul 1997 - 28 May 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brown, John Laurence Individual |
R D 2 Katikati 3178 |
10 Sep 1984 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rogers, Stephen Augustine Individual |
Katikati Katikati 3129 |
28 Mar 2007 - 08 Sep 2022 |
Brown, Suzanne Kay Individual |
R D 2 Katikati |
10 Sep 1984 - 28 Mar 2007 |
Rogers, Nadine Renee Individual |
R D 2 Katikati 3178 |
28 Mar 2007 - 22 Jun 2020 |
4 Bees Limited 13 Talisman Drive |
|
Johnson Builders 2010 Limited 13-4 Talisman Drive |
|
Living Decor Limited 13-4 Talisman Drive |
|
Go Pro Limited 13 Talisman Drive |
|
Southridge Lodge Limited Unit 3, 13 Talisman Drive |
|
Waterford Trustee Services Limited 13 Talisman Drive |
Beeworx Limited 383a Lockington Road |
Pi Hari Limited 317 Plummers Point Road |
Beeman Apiaries Limited 15 St Clements Grove |
Silverhope Apiaries Limited 99 Cambridge Road |
Bee Five Limited Level 1, 76 Grey St |
Bluesky Truffles Limited 2nd Floor |