Orewa Rental Cars (1983) Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429040006840) was launched on 07 Nov 1983. 1 address is currently in use by the company: 170 Hibiscus Coast Highway, Red Beach, Red Beach, 0932 (type: physical, registered). Unit K1, 75 Corinthian Drive, Albany, North Shore City had been their physical address, up to 15 Jun 2011. 12000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 80 shares (0.67% of shares), namely:
Wayne Mills (an individual) located at Orewa, Auckland. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 99.33% of all shares (exactly 11920 shares); it includes
Millsy Corporation Limited (an entity) - located at Red Beach, Red Beach. Businesscheck's database was updated on 11 May 2021.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
170 Hibiscus Coast Highway, Red Beach, Red Beach, 0932 | Physical & registered | 15 Jun 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Wayne John Mills
Manly, Whangaparaoa, 0930
Address used since 23 Jan 2019
Manly, Auckland, 0932
Address used since 26 May 2016 |
Director | 06 Jun 1992 - current |
Brian Leslie Johnson
Manly, Whangaparaoa,
Address used since 01 Apr 1998 |
Director | 01 Apr 1998 - 01 Apr 2008 |
Glen Thomas Mills
Whangaparaoa,
Address used since 01 Jun 1992 |
Director | 01 Jun 1992 - 01 Apr 1998 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit K1, 75 Corinthian Drive, Albany, North Shore City, 0632 | Physical & registered | 28 Sep 2010 - 15 Jun 2011 |
170 Hibiscus Coast Highway, Orewa | Physical & registered | 15 Sep 2008 - 28 Sep 2010 |
Suite One, Hallmark Building, Hillary Square, Orewa | Registered | 29 May 2001 - 15 Sep 2008 |
Dcl Limited, Suite 1a, Hallmark Building, Hillary Square, Orewa | Physical | 21 May 2001 - 15 Sep 2008 |
Darryl Lee & Co, Chartered Accountants, Suite One, Hallmark Bldg, Hillary Sq, Orewa | Physical | 21 May 2001 - 21 May 2001 |
Macnicol Lee & Co, Chartered, Accountants, Suite One, Hallmark, Bldg, Hillary Sq, Orewa | Physical | 26 Jun 1997 - 21 May 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wayne John Mills Individual |
Orewa Auckland |
07 Nov 1983 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Millsy Corporation Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041163672 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Red Beach Red Beach 0932 |
29 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Orewa Car Services (1990) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040427805 Company Number: 102298 Entity |
07 Nov 1983 - 29 Jul 2014 | |
Orewa Car Services (1990) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040427805 Company Number: 102298 Entity |
07 Nov 1983 - 29 Jul 2014 | |
Brian Leslie Johnson Individual |
Manly Whangaparaoa |
07 Nov 1983 - 14 May 2008 |
Plan Build Limited 170 Hibiscus Coast Highway |
|
Commercial Partnering Limited 170 Hibiscus Coast Highway |
|
Parasaurolophus Construction Limited 170 Hibiscus Coast Highway |
|
Linton Crescent Limited 170 Hibiscus Coast Highway |
|
Hibiscus Tanks Limited 170 Hibiscus Coast Highway |
|
Syllia Corp Limited 170 Hibiscus Coast Highway |